This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2017 at 02:26:49 (UTC).

Educational Impact, Inc. v. Scott

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 Educational Impact, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Scott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Simpson, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00351

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Simpson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Educational Impact, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Terrance M. Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Toby K. Henderson

Attorney at Sebaly Shillito & Dyer - 3

1900 Kettering Tower

Dayton, OH 45423

Scott Sander Davies

Attorney at Sebaly, Shillito, & Dyer

1900 Kettering Tower

Dayton, OH 45423

Evan L. Frank

Attorney at Alan L. Frank Law Associates, P.C.

135 Old York Road

Jenkintown, PA 19046

Alan L. Frank

Attorney at Alan L. Frank Law Associates, P.C.

135 Old York Road

Jenkintown, PA 19046

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brian P. McGraw

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 2600

Louisville, KY 40202

Jeffrey T. Cox

Attorney at Faruki Ireland & Cox PLL - 3

110 N. Main St., Suite 1600

Dayton, OH 45402

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Jeffrey T. Cox: No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

#43

(#43) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Alan L. Frank: No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

#42

(#42) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Evan L. Frank: No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

#41

(#41) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Scott Sander Davies: No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

#40

(#40) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Toby K. Henderson. No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

#39

(#39) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

38 #1

*Restricted*

#38

(#38) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-00941. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

#37

(#37) NOTICE VACATING MEDIATION set for 6/14/17 before Al McKenna. (sh) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 06/07/2017)

4 #1

Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Terrance M. Scott. Terrance M. Scott served on 10/3/2016, answer due 10/24/2016. (Davies, Scott) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 10/04/2016)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Terrance Scott. (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 09/30/2016)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Form

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Terrance Scott ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5676215), filed by Educational Impact, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davies, Scott) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 09/30/2016)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Jeffrey T. Cox: No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Alan L. Frank: No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Evan L. Frank: No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Scott Sander Davies: No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Toby K. Henderson. No record of attorney admittance to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/24/2017. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-00941. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JBM) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Case transferred to District of Western District of Kentucky. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE VACATING MEDIATION set for 6/14/17 before Al McKenna. (sh) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) OPINION AND ORDER denying #30 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's March 22, 2017 Order granting Defendant Dr. Terrance M. Scott's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Kentucky. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 06/06/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Defendant Terrance M. Scott. Responses due by 12/2/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Cox, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 11/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference of the parties set for 12/20/2016 @ 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (sh) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 10/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines pursuant to #7 Stipulation: Terrance M. Scott answer due 11/8/2016. (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 10/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION Agreed Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Terrance M. Scott. (Cox, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 10/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Cox for Defendant Terrance M. Scott (Cox, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 10/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alan L. Frank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 10/18/2016. (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 10/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5692843) of Alan L. Frank by Plaintiff Educational Impact, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (Davies, Scott) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 10/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Terrance M. Scott. Terrance M. Scott served on 10/3/2016, answer due 10/24/2016. (Davies, Scott) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 10/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Terrance Scott. (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 09/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Terrance Scott ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5676215), filed by Educational Impact, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davies, Scott) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/7/2017.] (Entered: 09/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less