This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2015 at 01:01:50 (UTC).

Eduardo Lopez v. ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Eduardo Lopez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ABM Janitorial Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-04719

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eduardo Lopez

Defendants

ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.

ABM Onsite Services-West Inc

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Haik Hacopian

Attorney at Law Offices of Zorik Mooradian

5023 North Parkway Calabasas

Encino, CA 91302

Zorik Mooradian

Attorney at Law Offices of Zorik Mooradian

5023 North Parkway Calabasas

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

Tracie L Childs

Attorney at Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP

550 West C Street Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Alfred M De La Cruz

Attorney at Manning and Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP

550 West C Street Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Jeffrey M Lenkov

Attorney at Manning and Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP

801 Tower South Figueroa Street 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#1

(#5) DECLARATION of Nedy Warren re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), # 1 filed by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#54

(#54) MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CERTIFY SUBCLASSES PURSUANT TO. FRCP 23 [22) held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED. Parties will have 60 days from the date of this order to conduct discovery limited to class certification. A Status Conference is set for May 11, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a joint status report by May 7, 2015. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (kss) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#53

(#53) NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez of Deposition Transcripts. (Hacopian, Haik) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#22

(#45) DECLARATION of Juilan Gonzalez In Opposition To MOTION to Certify Class # 22 filed by Defendant ABM Onsite Services-West Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

#52

(#52) REPLY in Support of MOTION to Certify Class # 22 filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Evidentiary Objections)(Hacopian, Haik) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

22 #4

Exhibit A-G

22 #3

Appendix of Exhibits

22 #5

Exhibit H-S

52 #1

Supplement Evidentiary Objections

22 #2

Declaration of Zorik Mooradian

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CERTIFY SUBCLASSES PURSUANT TO. FRCP 23 [22) held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED. Parties will have 60 days from the date of this order to conduct discovery limited to class certification. A Status Conference is set for May 11, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a joint status report by May 7, 2015. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (kss) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez of Deposition Transcripts. (Hacopian, Haik) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) REPLY in Support of MOTION to Certify Class # 22 filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Evidentiary Objections)(Hacopian, Haik) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER EXTENDING TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE REPLY by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Stipulation # 50 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Reply filing date regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification # 22 is hereby continued to 2/4/2015. (gk) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply, STIPULATION for Order Eduardo Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Mooradian, Zorik) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class # 22 previously scheduled for 02/19/2015 to 3/12/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) DECLARATION of Sonia Maldonado Fernandez In Opposition To MOTION to Certify Class # 22 filed by Defendant ABM Onsite Services-West Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) DECLARATION of Sam Frias In Opposition To MOTION to Certify Class # 22 filed by Defendant ABM Onsite Services-West Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) DECLARATION of Orlando Vivar In Opposition To MOTION to Certify Class # 22 filed by Defendant ABM Onsite Services-West Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) DECLARATION of Juilan Gonzalez In Opposition To MOTION to Certify Class # 22 filed by Defendant ABM Onsite Services-West Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials BeforeJudge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu (lc) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 14-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-04719 GW(Ex). (rn) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ABM Janitorial Services, Inc. answer now due 7/9/2014, filed by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services, Inc..(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 06/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants ABM Janitorial Services, Inc., Does 1 through 10. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL.] (et) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION of Nedy Warren re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), # 1 filed by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE to Adverse Parties filed by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Parties with Financial Interest filed by defendant ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC537945 Receipt No: 0973-13986627 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Alfred M De La Cruz added to party ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(De La Cruz, Alfred) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.