This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2018 at 07:50:48 (UTC).

Edison v. State of West Virginia et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 Edison filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of West Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael John Aloi, Irene M. Keeley and Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

Presiding Judges

Irene M. Keeley

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aaron A. Edison

Grafton, WV 26354

Defendants

Michelle Uvonne Edison

State of West Virginia

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Aaron Edison. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/2/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

6 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

6 #1

Court-Approved Form

#6

(#6) LETTER from Clerk of Court to Aaron Edison regarding non-payment of fee for filing of #1 Petition, and enclosing Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. (Mailed via CM, RRR.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

3 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) ORDER OF REFERRAL. Court REFERS this action to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi, United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct a scheduling conference and issue ascheduling order, for written orders or reports and recommendations. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/19/2018. (copy pro se plaintiff via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

1 #9

Envelope

1 #8

Exterior Property Violation

1 #7

Exterior Property Violation

1 #6

BCSE Payment Agreement

1 #5

Letter from Defense Finance and Accounting Service

1 #4

Letter from Defense and Accounting Service

1 #3

Letter to BCSE

1 #2

Article from WV Reporter

1 #1

Appendix Table of Contents

#1

(#1) PETITION SEEKING APPEAL AND RELIEF FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS against All Defendants, filed by Aaron A. Edison. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents, #2 Article from WV Reporter, #3 Letter to BCSE, #4 Letter from Defense and Accounting Service, #5 Letter from Defense Finance and Accounting Service, #6 BCSE Payment Agreement, #7 Exterior Property Violation, #8 Exterior Property Violation, #9 Envelope)(wrr) Modified on 10/17/2018 to correct docket text (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 10/17/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2018
  • (#10) Case reassigned to District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh per Order entered 11/30/2018 in case 3:18mc128. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to case. There are no hearings scheduled before the District Judge to be reset at this time. Copy of NEF and MC Order to pro se party by regular mail. (cmd) (Entered: 12/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ** SEALED** MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron A. Edison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WRONG EVENT USED (wrr). (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Aaron Edison. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/2/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER from Clerk of Court to Aaron Edison regarding non-payment of fee for filing of #1 Petition, and enclosing Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. (Mailed via CM, RRR.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice Of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/20/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF REFERRAL. Court REFERS this action to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi, United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct a scheduling conference and issue ascheduling order, for written orders or reports and recommendations. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/19/2018. (copy pro se plaintiff via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION SEEKING APPEAL AND RELIEF FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS against All Defendants, filed by Aaron A. Edison. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents, #2 Article from WV Reporter, #3 Letter to BCSE, #4 Letter from Defense and Accounting Service, #5 Letter from Defense Finance and Accounting Service, #6 BCSE Payment Agreement, #7 Exterior Property Violation, #8 Exterior Property Violation, #9 Envelope)(wrr) Modified on 10/17/2018 to correct docket text (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.