This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2018 at 07:39:42 (UTC).

EDGE v. BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE SALEM COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 EDGE filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE SALEM COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Tanya Walton Pratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JESSICA H EDGE

JESSICA H. EDGE

Defendant

BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE SALEM COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin W. Betz

Attorney at BETZ & BLEVINS

One Indiana Square, Suite 1660

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Jamie A. Maddox

Attorney at BETZ & ASSOCIATES

One Indiana Square, Suite 1660

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Sara R. Blevins

Attorney at LEWIS & KAPPES PC

One American Square, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46282

Emma Elizabeth Jay

Attorney at LEWIS & KAPPES, P.C.

One American Square, Ste. 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46282

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion

#14

(#14) MOTION to Seal Document #13 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit 1, filed by Plaintiff JESSICA H. EDGE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Maddox, Jamie) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

13 #28

Exhibit 30 - Letter dated June 26 2018

13 #27

Exhibit 29- Notice of Recommendation

13 #26

Exhibit 28 - Letter to Superintendent

13 #25

Exhibit 27 - Notice of Decision

13 #24

Exhibit 26 - May 7 2018 Letter

13 #23

Exhibit 20 - February 19 2018 Letter

13 #10

Exhibit 2-B - Last Chance Agreement

13 #9

Exhibit 2-A - Withdrawal of Recommendation

13 #8

Exhibit 1-E - Request for Conference

13 #6

Exhibit 1-C - Written Response

13 #5

Exhibit 1-B - Notice of Decision

13 #4

Exhibit 1-A - Notice of Leave

13 #3

Exhibit Exhibits Summary

13 #2

Exhibit Certification of Exhibits

13 #1

*Restricted*

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Filing of Agency Record by JESSICA H. EDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Transcript, #2 Exhibit Certification of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibits Summary, #4 Exhibit 1-A - Notice of Leave, #5 Exhibit 1-B - Notice of Decision, #6 Exhibit 1-C - Written Response, #7 Exhibit 1-D - Recommendation, #8 Exhibit 1-E - Request for Conference, #9 Exhibit 2-A - Withdrawal of Recommendation, #10 Exhibit 2-B - Last Chance Agreement, #11 Exhibit 3-A - Teacher Reassignment, #12 Exhibit 3-B - FMLA Forms, #13 Exhibit 3-C - Request for Additional Information, #14 Exhibit 3-D - Follow Up Request, #15 Exhibit 3-E - Exhaustion of Leave, #16 Exhibit 3-F - Failure to Return, #17 Exhibit 4-A - FMLA Certification, #18 Exhibit 4-B - Revised FMLA Certification, #19 Exhibit 4-C - Revised FMLA Certification, #20 Exhibit 7-A - Email Regarding Day Care, #21 Exhibit 8-A - Return from Leave Policy, #22 Exhibit 8-B - FMLA Leave Policy, #23 Exhibit 20 - February 19 2018 Letter, #24 Exhibit 26 - May 7 2018 Letter, #25 Exhibit 27 - Notice of Decision, #26 Exhibit 28 - Letter to Superintendent, #27 Exhibit 29- Notice of Recommendation, #28 Exhibit 30 - Letter dated June 26 2018) (Maddox, Jamie) Modified on 11/6/2018 (MAT). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REDACTION to #14 MOTION to Seal Document #13 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit 1 by JESSICA H. EDGE. (Maddox, Jamie) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Seal Document #13 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit 1, filed by Plaintiff JESSICA H. EDGE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Maddox, Jamie) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Filing of Agency Record by JESSICA H. EDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Transcript, #2 Exhibit Certification of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibits Summary, #4 Exhibit 1-A - Notice of Leave, #5 Exhibit 1-B - Notice of Decision, #6 Exhibit 1-C - Written Response, #7 Exhibit 1-D - Recommendation, #8 Exhibit 1-E - Request for Conference, #9 Exhibit 2-A - Withdrawal of Recommendation, #10 Exhibit 2-B - Last Chance Agreement, #11 Exhibit 3-A - Teacher Reassignment, #12 Exhibit 3-B - FMLA Forms, #13 Exhibit 3-C - Request for Additional Information, #14 Exhibit 3-D - Follow Up Request, #15 Exhibit 3-E - Exhaustion of Leave, #16 Exhibit 3-F - Failure to Return, #17 Exhibit 4-A - FMLA Certification, #18 Exhibit 4-B - Revised FMLA Certification, #19 Exhibit 4-C - Revised FMLA Certification, #20 Exhibit 7-A - Email Regarding Day Care, #21 Exhibit 8-A - Return from Leave Policy, #22 Exhibit 8-B - FMLA Leave Policy, #23 Exhibit 20 - February 19 2018 Letter, #24 Exhibit 26 - May 7 2018 Letter, #25 Exhibit 27 - Notice of Decision, #26 Exhibit 28 - Letter to Superintendent, #27 Exhibit 29- Notice of Recommendation, #28 Exhibit 30 - Letter dated June 26 2018) (Maddox, Jamie) Modified on 11/6/2018 (MAT). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Elizabeth Jay on behalf of Defendant BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE SALEM COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Jay, Emma) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2018 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time), in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/16/2018. (MAT) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/2/2018 to file the agency record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/12/2018. (MAT) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE SALEM COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Blevins, Sara) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Blevins on behalf of Defendant BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE SALEM COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Blevins, Sara) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/02/18 to File Agency Record, filed by Plaintiff JESSICA H. EDGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Requesting Record, #2 Exhibit B - Email re: Extension, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for EOT)(Maddox, Jamie) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE SALEM COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (MAT) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE SALEM COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Maddox, Jamie) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Betz on behalf of Plaintiff JESSICA H EDGE. (Betz, Kevin) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie A. Maddox on behalf of Plaintiff JESSICA H EDGE. (Maddox, Jamie) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE SALEM COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, filed by JESSICA H EDGE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5058176) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Findings of Fact, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Defendant)(Maddox, Jamie) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.