This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:30:37 (UTC).

Eckerd v. Corrections Corporation of America et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Eckerd filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Corrections Corporation of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00071

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew William Eckerd

Defendants

Unknown C/O(s)

C/O FNU Suggs

Correct Care Solutions

Lucy White

FNU Barefoot

Corrections Corporation of America

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Letter from Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ca) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) NOTICE re: Filing Fee Withdrawal Authorization by Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with a blank copy of the application to proceed in forma pauperis form which asks prisoner-plaintiffs questions about their inmate trust accounts on page 2 of this application. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to submit his application on the provided form within fourteen (14) days of this Order. (Compliance due by 11/16/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/2/2018. (ca) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #4 Amended Complaint, signature was omitted. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/5/2018. (ca) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) DECLARATION by Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

4 #3

Signature Page

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Prepared Summons

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) INCOMPLETE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ca) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE re: Filing Fee Withdrawal Authorization by Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with a blank copy of the application to proceed in forma pauperis form which asks prisoner-plaintiffs questions about their inmate trust accounts on page 2 of this application. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to submit his application on the provided form within fourteen (14) days of this Order. (Compliance due by 11/16/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/2/2018. (ca) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #4 Amended Complaint, signature was omitted. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/5/2018. (ca) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION by Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachments: #1 Prepared Summons, #2 Envelope)(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2018: #3 Signature Page) (ca). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) *Entered in error*Summons Submitted. (csr) Modified on 9/18/2018 (ca). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INCOMPLETE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrew William Eckerd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2018: #2 Prepared Summons) (ca). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less