This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Eckel-Tipton v. Alharbi et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Eckel-Tipton filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Alharbi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey J. Helmick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01946

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Heather Eckel-Tipton

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Zaid Zaidan M Alharbi

National Railway Carriers and United Transportation Union Health and Welfare Plan

Norfolk Southern Corporation Off-Track Vehicle Accident Plan

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant

Norfolk Southern Corporation Off-Track Vehicle Accident Plan

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Zaid Zaidan M Alharbi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Charles E. Boyk

Attorney at Law Office of Charles E. Boyk

405 Madison Avenue

Toledo, OH 43604

Kathleen R. Harris

Attorney at Law Office of Charles E. Boyk

405 Madison Avenue

Toledo, OH 43604

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Sheila A. McKeon

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp - Toledo

420 Madison Avenue

Toledo, OH 43604

Joseph S. Center

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp - Cleveland

300 Madison Avenue

Toledo, OH 43604

Richard A. Di Lisi

Attorney at Ste. 200

4125 Highlander Pkwy

Richfield, OH 44286

Shaun D. Byroads

Po Box 6599

Cleveland, OH 44114

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Richard A. Di Lisi

Attorney at Ste. 200

4125 Highlander Pkwy

Richfield, OH 44286

 

Court Documents

#1

(#8) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Supplement to Notice of Removal to Include Served and/or Filed Documents after Removal, filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1.NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plans Motion to Intervene and File an Intervening Complaint Instanter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plan's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendant NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plan's Intervening Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plan's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Leave to Intervene as a Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer and Cross-claim of Defendant, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, with Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, #6 Exhibit 6 - Praecipe for Answer and Crossclaim, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons)(McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Marginal Entry Order granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company answer due 9/7/2018. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/31/2018.(SG,D) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#7

(#16) Motion for extension of time until 11/04/2018 to Answer the Counterclaim filed by Defendant OTVA filed by Plaintiff Heather Eckel-Tipton. Related document(s) #7 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#8

(#8) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Supplement to Notice of Removal to Include Served and/or Filed Documents after Removal, filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1.NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plans Motion to Intervene and File an Intervening Complaint Instanter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plan's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendant NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plan's Intervening Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plan's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Leave to Intervene as a Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer and Cross-claim of Defendant, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, with Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, #6 Exhibit 6 - Praecipe for Answer and Crossclaim, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons)(McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#21

(#21) Order: the case management conference scheduled for October 22, 2018 is vacated pending adjudication of the pending motions. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/9/2018. (S,AL) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#20

(#20) Marginal Entry Order granting defendant Norfolk Southern Corp's motion for extension of time until November 7, 2018 to file response/reply to plaintiff's motion to remand. Related #18 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/9/2018.(S,AL) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#18

RESTRICTED

#19

(#19) Order granting plaintiff's motion for an extension of time until 10/26/2018 to respond to NRC/UTU Health & Welfare Plan's motion to dismiss and intervene. #11 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/9/2018.(S,AL) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#11

(#19) Order granting plaintiff's motion for an extension of time until 10/26/2018 to respond to NRC/UTU Health & Welfare Plan's motion to dismiss and intervene. #11 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/9/2018.(S,AL) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#10

(#18) Motion for extension of time until November 7, 2018 to file response/reply to #10 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Related document(s) #10 . (McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#17

(#17) Order granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff Heather Eckel-Tipton shall have an extension of time up to and including 11/4/2018 to respond to Defendant OTVA's Counterclaim. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/2/2018.(SG,D) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#16

(#16) Motion for extension of time until 11/04/2018 to Answer the Counterclaim filed by Defendant OTVA filed by Plaintiff Heather Eckel-Tipton. Related document(s) #7 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#15

(#15) Notice to Include Answer Served and/or Filed Before and/or After Removal filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Nationwide's Lucas County Common Pleas Court Answer and Cross-Claim, #2 Exhibit Defendant Nationwide's Lucas County Common Pleas Court Instructions for Service)(Di Lisi, Richard) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#14

RESTRICTED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Order: the case management conference scheduled for October 22, 2018 is vacated pending adjudication of the pending motions. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/9/2018. (S,AL) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Marginal Entry Order granting defendant Norfolk Southern Corp's motion for extension of time until November 7, 2018 to file response/reply to plaintiff's motion to remand. Related #18 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/9/2018.(S,AL) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Order granting plaintiff's motion for an extension of time until 10/26/2018 to respond to NRC/UTU Health & Welfare Plan's motion to dismiss and intervene. #11 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/9/2018.(S,AL) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Motion for extension of time until November 7, 2018 to file response/reply to #10 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Related document(s) #10 . (McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Order granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff Heather Eckel-Tipton shall have an extension of time up to and including 11/4/2018 to respond to Defendant OTVA's Counterclaim. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/2/2018.(SG,D) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Motion for extension of time until 11/04/2018 to Answer the Counterclaim filed by Defendant OTVA filed by Plaintiff Heather Eckel-Tipton. Related document(s) #7 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Notice to Include Answer Served and/or Filed Before and/or After Removal filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Nationwide's Lucas County Common Pleas Court Answer and Cross-Claim, #2 Exhibit Defendant Nationwide's Lucas County Common Pleas Court Instructions for Service)(Di Lisi, Richard) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Answer to Defendant, Norfolk Southern Corporation Off-Track Vehicle Accident Plan's Cross-Claim filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Di Lisi, Richard) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Di Lisi, Richard) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Service filed by Heather Eckel-Tipton. (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Supplement to Notice of Removal to Include Served and/or Filed Documents after Removal, filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1.NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plans Motion to Intervene and File an Intervening Complaint Instanter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plan's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendant NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plan's Intervening Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant NRC/UTU Health and Welfare Plan's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Leave to Intervene as a Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer and Cross-claim of Defendant, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, with Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, #6 Exhibit 6 - Praecipe for Answer and Crossclaim, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons)(McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Answer to Complaint with Counterclaim and Cross-Claim (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Receipts, #2 Exhibit B-Plan)(McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Marginal Entry Order granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company answer due 9/7/2018. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/31/2018.(SG,D) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion for extension of time until September 7, 2018 to answer complaint filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Related document(s) #1 . (McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal from Lucas County Court of Common Pleas, case number G-4801-CI-0201803155-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8875909.. Filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - The Plan's Consent) (McKeon, Sheila) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.