This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2019 at 07:36:16 (UTC).

Eastern Properties v. Williams

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Eastern Properties filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Walter E. Johnson, Orinda D. Evans and Charles A. Pannell, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05367

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

Presiding Judges

Orinda D. Evans

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eastern Properties

101 Typellan Ave

State Island, NY 10309

Defendant

Demetrice Williams

Decatur, GA 30032

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER regarding the defendant's untimely Objections to the Report and Recommendation #8 . The Court's order adopting the magistrate judge's report and recommendation #6 will not be reconsidered. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 1/3/19. (ddm) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#8

(#8) OBJECTIONS to #3 Final Report and Recommendation filed by Demetrice Williams. (sap) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

7 #1

Envelope Receipt

#7

(#7) Certified copy of #6 Order efiled with the Clerk of Court, Magistrate Court of Dekalb County. (tcc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #1 Envelope Receipt) (tcc). (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER - After carefully considering the #3 final report and recommendation of the magistrate judge and finding no error, the court receives the report and recommendation with approval and adopts it as the opinion and order of this court. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/26/2018. (tcc) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge Orinda D. Evans no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-05367-CAP. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 12/10/2018. (sap) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Order and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/4/18. (klb) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - the Court GRANTS the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #1 for the limited purpose of remand, and RECOMMENDS this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County, Georgia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/4/18. (klb) Modified on 12/7/2018 (usw). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Demetrice Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eastern Properties, Demetrice Williams re #9 Order. (ddm) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER regarding the defendant's untimely Objections to the Report and Recommendation #8 . The Court's order adopting the magistrate judge's report and recommendation #6 will not be reconsidered. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 1/3/19. (ddm) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OBJECTIONS to #3 Final Report and Recommendation filed by Demetrice Williams. (sap) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eastern Properties, Demetrice Williams re #7 Letter, #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tcc) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certified copy of #6 Order efiled with the Clerk of Court, Magistrate Court of Dekalb County. (tcc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #1 Envelope Receipt) (tcc). (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Civil Case Terminated. (tcc) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - After carefully considering the #3 final report and recommendation of the magistrate judge and finding no error, the court receives the report and recommendation with approval and adopts it as the opinion and order of this court. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/26/2018. (tcc) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eastern Properties and Demetrice Williams re #5 Order Reassigning Case with the NEF. (sap) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge Orinda D. Evans no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-05367-CAP. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 12/10/2018. (sap) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eastern Properties, Demetrice Williams re #3 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Order and Final Report and Recommendation. (klb) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Order and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/4/18. (klb) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - the Court GRANTS the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #1 for the limited purpose of remand, and RECOMMENDS this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County, Georgia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/4/18. (klb) Modified on 12/7/2018 (usw). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Demetrice Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for the limited purpose of remand (found in text of Order and Final Report & Recommendation). Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/4/18. (klb) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans for review. (rlb) M (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (rlb) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Demetrice Williams. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant