This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2019 at 08:12:01 (UTC).

East Bay Community Action Program v. Old Republic Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 East Bay Community Action Program filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Old Republic Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00640

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

East Bay Community Action Program

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Old Republic Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Joseph Fragomeni

Attorney at SHECHTMAN HALPERIN SAVAGE, LLP

1080 Main Street

Pawtucket, Ri, RI 02860

Girard R. Visconti

Attorney at Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

1080 Main Street, 272-1400, Fax: 272-1403

Pawtucket, RI 02860

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Carl S. Levin

Attorney at Gilstein, Kinder & Levin, LLP

300 Metro Center Blvd., Suite 150A

Warwick, RI 02886

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 10/16/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/18/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/17/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 1/16/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be by 2/18/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#11

(#11) RULE 16 STATEMENT of PLAINTIFF by East Bay Community Action Program. (Visconti, Girard) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#10

(#10) RULE 16 STATEMENT Old Republic Insurance Co by All Defendants. (Levin, Carl) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 1/16/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#8

(#8) Reply to Counterclaim of Counterclaim Defendant by East Bay Community Action Program. (Visconti, Girard) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#7

(#7) EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Old Republic Insurance Company in support of #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Exhibit A to Counterclaim. (Levin, Carl) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

6 #1

Counterclaim

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against East Bay Community Action Program by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim)(Levin, Carl) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by East Bay Community Action Program. Old Republic Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Visconti, Girard) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#4

(#4) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Levin, Carl) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

1 #3

Certificate of Notice

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8116. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1290206, filed by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Notice)(Levin, Carl) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 10/16/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/18/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/17/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 1/16/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be by 2/18/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 1/16/2019; Girard R. Visconti, David Campbell, Carl S. Levin and Gabriella Gaal participated (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RULE 16 STATEMENT of PLAINTIFF by East Bay Community Action Program. (Visconti, Girard) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RULE 16 STATEMENT Old Republic Insurance Co by All Defendants. (Levin, Carl) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 1/16/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Reply to Counterclaim of Counterclaim Defendant by East Bay Community Action Program. (Visconti, Girard) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Old Republic Insurance Company in support of #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Exhibit A to Counterclaim. (Levin, Carl) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against East Bay Community Action Program by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim)(Levin, Carl) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by East Bay Community Action Program. Old Republic Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Visconti, Girard) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Levin, Carl) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8116. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1290206, filed by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Notice)(Levin, Carl) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Levin, Carl) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8116. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1290206, filed by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Notice)(Levin, Carl) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less