This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:58:09 (UTC).

Ears & Hearing, P.A. v. Blue Cross and Blue Sheild of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Ears Hearing, P A filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blue Cross and Blue Sheild of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00726

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ears & Hearing, P.A.

Defendant

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William T. Peckham

Attorney at Law Office of William T. Peckham

1104 Nueces Street, Suite 104

Austin, TX 78701-2106

Defendant Attorneys

Cheryl Lee Blount

Attorney at ReedSmith LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002-6110

Thomas C. Hardy

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Jason T. Mayer

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin J. Bishop

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

811 Main Street, Floor 17

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason T. Mayer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl Lee Blount Jason Mayer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11170305) by on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Martin Bishop. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl Lee Blount Martin Bishop ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11170245) by on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas C. Hardy. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl Lee Blount Thomas C. Hardy ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11170184) by on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit C-5

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason T. Mayer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Martin Bishop. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas C. Hardy. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,, Certified State Court Pleadings by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl Lee Blount Jason Mayer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11170305) by on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl Lee Blount Martin Bishop ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11170245) by on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl Lee Blount Thomas C. Hardy ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11170184) by on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to Martin Bishop re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,, to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation. (Blount, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blue Cross and Blue Sheild of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11158781), filed by Blue Cross and Blue Sheild of Texas, a Division of Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit C-4, #8 Exhibit C-5, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blount, Cheryl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/24/2018 to correct document orientation) (afd). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.