This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2018 at 07:21:44 (UTC).

Earhart v. Matson Navigation Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 Earhart filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Matson Navigation Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benjamin H. Settle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-05713

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin H. Settle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTOPHER L. EARHART

Christopher L Earhart

Defendant

Matson Navigation Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J Davies

Attorney at KRAFT DAVIES, PLLC

One Union Square, 600 University Street, Ste 1904

Seattle, WA 98101

Marissa A. Olsson

Attorney at KRAFT DAVIES, PLLC

One Union Square, 600 University Street, Ste 1904

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Molly J. Henry

Attorney at SCHWABE WILLIAMSON & WYATT (SEA)

1420 5Th Ave, Ste 3400

Seattle, WA 98101-2339

Philip Raoul Lempriere

Attorney at SCHWABE WILLIAMSON & WYATT (SEA)

1420 5Th Ave, Ste 3400

Seattle, WA 98101-2339

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Matson, Inc. for Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. (Henry, Molly) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages by Matson Navigation Company, Inc..(Henry, Molly) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Molly J. Henry on behalf of Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. (Henry, Molly) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip Raoul Lempriere on behalf of Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. (Lempriere, Philip) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Matson Navigation Company, Inc. on 9/18/2018, filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Earhart. (Davies, Richard) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Matson Navigation Company, Inc. (GMR) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

6 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #3 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher L Earhart (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Davies, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/20/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/27/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants, filed by Christopher L Earhart.(Davies, Richard) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE TO FILER: of Case Opening Deficiency. ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5455709), filed by Christopher L Earhart. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davies, Richard) Modified on 9/4/2018 (GMR). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Matson, Inc. for Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. (Henry, Molly) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages by Matson Navigation Company, Inc..(Henry, Molly) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Molly J. Henry on behalf of Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. (Henry, Molly) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip Raoul Lempriere on behalf of Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. (Lempriere, Philip) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Matson Navigation Company, Inc. on 9/18/2018, filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Earhart. (Davies, Richard) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Matson Navigation Company, Inc. (GMR) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #3 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher L Earhart (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Davies, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/20/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/27/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Marissa A. Olsson added for Christopher L Earhart per #3 Amended Complaint. (GMR) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants, filed by Christopher L Earhart.(Davies, Richard) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE TO FILER: of Case Opening Deficiency. ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5455709), filed by Christopher L Earhart. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davies, Richard) Modified on 9/4/2018 (GMR). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.