This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:26:05 (UTC).

E&A HOLDINGS, LLC v. LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO. INC.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 E A HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark J. Dinsmore and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02400

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

E&A HOLDINGS, LLC

E&A HOLDINGS, INC.

Defendants

LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO. INC.

LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J. Detherage

Attorney at BARNES & THORNBURG, LLP (Indianapolis)

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Andrea Savannah Warren

Attorney at BARNES & THORNBURG

11 South Meridian St.

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Louise Kandyba

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER LLP (Chicago)

55 W. Monroe, Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

Edward A. DeVries

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER LLP (Chicago)

55 W. Monroe, Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

26 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Tarter

26 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kashman

#26

(#26) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Plaintiff E&A HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kashman, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Tarter)(Warren, Andrea) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#25

(#25) REPLY in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Proceedings , filed by Defendant LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#24

(#24) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Proceedings , filed by Plaintiff E&A HOLDINGS, LLC. (Warren, Andrea) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#20

(#20) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC. United States Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is hereby designated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) (B) to issue proposed findings and recommendations regarding the appropriate disposition. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/19/2018. Motions referred to Mark J. Dinsmore.(MAC) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#15

(#16) ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery and Proceedings. [Dkt. #15 .] The Court hereby advises the parties that, pending a ruling on Defendant's Motion, the telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for September 18, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Eastern) remains on calendar and will proceed as scheduled [Dkt. #10 ], and the parties are reminded to file a proposed Case Management Plan by no later than September 11, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/10/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#20) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC. United States Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is hereby designated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) (B) to issue proposed findings and recommendations regarding the appropriate disposition. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/19/2018. Motions referred to Mark J. Dinsmore.(MAC) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO. INC.. (LAB) (CKM) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Defendant Leviton Manufacturing Co. Inc.. (Kandyba, Mary) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant Leviton Manufacturing Co. Inc.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. DeVries on behalf of Defendant Leviton Manufacturing Co. Inc.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

1 #1

State Court Record Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 1:18-cv-2400, filed by Leviton Manufacturing Co. Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5002986) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Exhibit A)(DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Plaintiff E&A HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kashman, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Tarter)(Warren, Andrea) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) REPLY in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Proceedings , filed by Defendant LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Proceedings , filed by Plaintiff E&A HOLDINGS, LLC. (Warren, Andrea) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC. United States Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is hereby designated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) (B) to issue proposed findings and recommendations regarding the appropriate disposition. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/19/2018. Motions referred to Mark J. Dinsmore.(MAC) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SCHEDULING ORDER- The parties are hereby ordered to schedule a private mediation of this matter to take place no later than January 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/18/2018.(CBU) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/2019. Discovery due by 5/10/2019. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/18/2018. (GD) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/18/2018. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/26/2018 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER Regarding Protective Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/18/2018.(CBU) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff E&A HOLDINGS, LLC . (Warren, Andrea) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery and Proceedings. [Dkt. #15 .] The Court hereby advises the parties that, pending a ruling on Defendant's Motion, the telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for September 18, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Eastern) remains on calendar and will proceed as scheduled [Dkt. #10 ], and the parties are reminded to file a proposed Case Management Plan by no later than September 11, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/10/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2018 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/23/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Submission of Additional State Court Records Marion Superior, Civil Division 1 49C01-1807-PL-047477 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CKM) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO. INC.. (LAB) (CKM) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Defendant Leviton Manufacturing Co. Inc.. (Kandyba, Mary) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant Leviton Manufacturing Co. Inc.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. DeVries on behalf of Defendant Leviton Manufacturing Co. Inc.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 1:18-cv-2400, filed by Leviton Manufacturing Co. Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5002986) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Exhibit A)(DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less