This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 13:24:01 (UTC).

e-ImageData Corp v. Digital Check Corp

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 e-ImageData Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Digital Check Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruben Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05206

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ruben Castillo

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

E-Imagedata Corp.

Defendant

Digital Check Corp. doing business as ST Imaging

Counter Claimant

Digital Check Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David P Muth

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2350

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4426

Matthew J Duchemin

Attorney at Quarles & Brady Llp

33 East Main Street, Suite 900

Madison, WI 53703

Michael T Piery

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2350

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4426

Johanna M. Wilbert

Attorney at Quarles & Brady Llp

411 E. Wisconsin Ave., Ste 2350

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Eric J Van Schyndle

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2350

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4426

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Stephen J. O'Neil

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 West Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Jason Alexander Engel

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 West Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Kacy Lee Dicke

Attorney at K&l Gates

70 W. Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Brett J. Weber

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W. Madison St., Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#72

#71

#70

#69

#68

#67

#66

#65

#64

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER: Johanna M. Wilbert's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff #71 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/28/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14986279. (Wilbert, Johanna) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) ORDER: Michael T. Piery's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #69 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/20/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14955312. (Michael, Piery) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff E-Imagedata Corp. by Matthew J Duchemin (Duchemin, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 10/4/2018. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 10/10/2018 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, ) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Digital Check Corp., Defendant Digital Check Corp. by Brett J. Weber (Weber, Brett) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Digital Check Corp., Defendant Digital Check Corp. by Kacy Lee Dicke (Dicke, Kacy) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Digital Check Corp., Defendant Digital Check Corp. by Jason Alexander Engel (Engel, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 18 CV 5206, e-ImageData Corp v. Digital Check Corp, is pending before the Hon. Robert W. Gettleman, has been identified for transfer to the Patent Case Pilot Program in which this Court is participating; therefore It is hereby ordered that 18 CV 5206, e-ImageData Corp v. Digital Check Corp, is to be reassigned by lot to one of the district judges participating in the pilot program. Case reassigned to the Honorable Ruben Castillo for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/2/2018. (bg, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against e-ImageData Corp. with Jury Demand filed by Digital Check Corp . (O'Neil, Stephen) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 06/03/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J O'Neil on behalf of Digital Check Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Stephen J. O'Neil (O'Neil, Stephen) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 06/03/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by e-ImageData Corp. (Wilbert, Johanna) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 05/27/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Waiver of Service by e-ImageData Corp. (Wilbert, Johanna) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 05/27/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Digital Check Corp. (blr) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 05/13/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Wilbert, Johanna) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 05/12/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna M Wilbert on behalf of e-ImageData Corp.. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Duchemin, David P. Muth, Johanna M. Wilbert, Eric J. Van Schyndle and Michael T. Piery (Wilbert, Johanna) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 05/12/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Rudolph T Randa ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 05/12/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by e-ImageData Corp.. (Wilbert, Johanna) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 05/12/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Digital Check Corp. by e-ImageData Corp.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2336986) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilbert, Johanna) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/31/2018.] (Entered: 05/12/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E-ImageData Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Digital Check Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kacy Lee Dicke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Alexander Engel