3:18-CV-05590
09/12/2018
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Trademark
Richard Seeborg
E-Go Bike LLC
Rack 'Em
Rack'Em Mfg, LLC
John Pallay, Jr.
Glenn Johnson
Frederick A. Tecce
J. Leah Castella
Alice A. Kelly
Richard S. Mandaro
Anthony Francis Lo Cicero
Anthony F. Lo Cicero
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Civil Cover Sheet
Docket(#23) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Further Extend Time to Respond to Complaint for Declaratory Relief filed by Glenn Johnson, John Pallay, Jr., Rack 'Em, Rack'Em Mfg, LLC. (Mandaro, Richard) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference.Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/29/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rack 'Em, Rack'Em Mfg, LLC.. (Mandaro, Richard) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/29/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint for Declaratory Relief filed by Rack 'Em, Rack'Em Mfg, LLC. (Mandaro, Richard) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Mandaro (Mandaro, Richard) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Francis Lo Cicero (Lo Cicero, Anthony) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by E-Go Bike LLC re #8 Summons Issued In A Civil Action (Kelly, Alice) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Frederick A. Tecce ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12692390.) Filing fee previously paid on 09-19-2018 filed by E-Go Bike LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Tecce, Frederick) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Summons Issued as to Glenn Johnson, John Pallay, Jr., Rack 'Em, Rack'Em Mfg, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Alice A. Kelly (Kelly, Alice) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by E-Go Bike LLC re #2 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint (Castella, J.) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by E-Go Bike LLC identifying Other Affiliate Bing Liu for E-Go Bike LLC. re #2 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint (Castella, J.) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Castella, J.) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Glenn Johnson, John Pallay, Jr., Rack 'Em, Rack'Em Mfg, LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12673208). Filed by E-Go Bike LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castella, J.) (Filed on 9/12/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/12/2018)
[-] Read Less