This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2018 at 07:01:45 (UTC).

DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG et al v. Hunting Titan, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2017 DynaEnergetics GmbH Co KG filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hunting Titan, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray H Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-CV-03784

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG

DynaEnergetics US, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Hunting Energy Services, Inc.

Hunting Titan, Ltd.

Hunting Titan, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Megan Charlotte Moore

Barry Jeff Herman

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Jason Allan Saunders

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

Request for Issuance of Summons to Hunting Titan, Ltd.

7 #1

Request for Issuance of Summons to Hunting Titan, Inc.

#7

#6

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Hunting Titan, Inc., Hunting Energy Services, Inc., filed.(Saunders, Jason) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hunting Energy Services, Inc., Hunting Titan, Inc., filed.(Saunders, Jason) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hunting Titan, Ltd. served on 1/10/2018, answer due 1/31/2018, filed.(Moore, Megan) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hunting Titan, Inc. served on 1/10/2018, answer due 1/31/2018, filed.(Moore, Megan) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hunting Energy Services, Inc. served on 1/10/2018, answer due 1/31/2018, filed.(Moore, Megan) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hunting Energy Services, Inc., Hunting Titan, Inc., Hunting Titan, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: #1 Request for Issuance of Summons to Hunting Titan, Inc., #2 Request for Issuance of Summons to Hunting Titan, Ltd.)(Moore, Megan) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed.(Moore, Megan) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Megan) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 4/27/2018. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2018. (Moore, Megan) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19338528) filed by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Megan) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less