This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2018 at 07:38:09 (UTC).

DYE v. MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 DYE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Lawrence and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02802

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Lawrence

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TERRY R DYE

TERRY R. DYE

Defendants

BRADLEY K SHAW

INDIANA STATE POLICE

MIKE TUMMERS

MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT

BRADLEY K. SHAW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glen Emmett Koch, II

Attorney at BOREN OLIVER & COFFEY

59 North Jefferson Street

Martinsville, IN 46151

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas Alan Hoffman

Attorney at CARSON LLP

5010 N. Stone Mill Road, Suite 100

Bloomington, IN 47408

Bryan Findley

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 West Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South, Fifth Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff TERRY R. DYE. (Koch, Glen) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

12 #3

Exhibit Probable Cause Order

12 #2

Exhibit Charging Information

12 #1

Exhibit Probable Cause Affidavit

#12

(#12) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants INDIANA STATE POLICE, MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K. SHAW, MIKE TUMMERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Probable Cause Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Charging Information, #3 Exhibit Probable Cause Order)(Findley, Bryan) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants INDIANA STATE POLICE, MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K. SHAW, MIKE TUMMERS. (Findley, Bryan) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Glen Emmett Koch, II on behalf of Plaintiff TERRY R. DYE. (Koch, Glen) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting Defendants' #8 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/19/2018 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. All other requirements of the Court's order (Dkt. #7 ) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/11/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue

#8

(#8) MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial Conference, filed by Defendants MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K. SHAW. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue)(Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/28/2018.(CBU) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants INDIANA STATE POLICE, MIKE TUMMERS. (Findley, Bryan) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

5 #1

Exhibit A File Stamped State Appearance of Findley

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Findley on behalf of Defendants INDIANA STATE POLICE, MIKE TUMMERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A File Stamped State Appearance of Findley) (Findley, Bryan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

3 #1

Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal to Adverse Party and State Court Clerk by MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K SHAW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Alan Hoffman on behalf of Defendants MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K SHAW. (Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff TERRY R. DYE. (Koch, Glen) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants INDIANA STATE POLICE, MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K. SHAW, MIKE TUMMERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Probable Cause Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Charging Information, #3 Exhibit Probable Cause Order)(Findley, Bryan) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants INDIANA STATE POLICE, MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K. SHAW, MIKE TUMMERS. (Findley, Bryan) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Glen Emmett Koch, II on behalf of Plaintiff TERRY R. DYE. (Koch, Glen) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting Defendants' #8 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/19/2018 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. All other requirements of the Court's order (Dkt. #7 ) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/11/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial Conference, filed by Defendants MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K. SHAW. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue)(Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/28/2018.(CBU) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants INDIANA STATE POLICE, MIKE TUMMERS. (Findley, Bryan) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Findley on behalf of Defendants INDIANA STATE POLICE, MIKE TUMMERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A File Stamped State Appearance of Findley) (Findley, Bryan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal to Adverse Party and State Court Clerk by MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K SHAW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Alan Hoffman on behalf of Defendants MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K SHAW. (Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Morgan Superior Court, case number 55D02-1808-CT-001599, filed by MARSHAL OF THE BROOKLYN POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRADLEY K SHAW. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5057859) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint and Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Consent to Removal)(Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.