Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2017 at 05:22:41 (UTC).

Dydzak v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2017 Dydzak filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-04360

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel D. Dydzak

Maina Del Rey, CA 90292

Defendants

Jeffrey L. Bleich

Kiry Gray

Eric M. George

Ronald M. George

Edward Leavy

Consuelo M. Callahan

United States of America

Virginia A. Phillips

Cynthia A. Snyder

1st Century Bancshares, Inc.

Ellen S. Huvelle

Manuel Lawrence Real

Matthew C. Rogers

Alan Rothenberg

Tani Canti-Sakauye

Robert H. Whaley

Claudia Ann Wilken

Steven V. Wilson

McKinsey and Company

7 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to 1st Century Bancshares, Inc., 1st Century Bank, N.A., Jeffrey L. Bleich, Consuelo M. Callahan, Tani Canti-Sakauye, John C. Coughenour, Molly C. Dwyer, Eric M. George, Ronald M. George, Kiry Gray, Ellen S. Huvelle, Edward Leavy, McKinsey and Company, Virginia A. Phillips, Manuel Lawrence Real, Matthew C. Rogers, Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, Alan Rothenberg, Charles Schwab, Milan D. Smith, Jr, Cynthia A. Snyder, Sidney R. Thomas, United States of America, Robert H. Whaley, Claudia Ann Wilken, Steven V. Wilson. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017) Modified on 8/8/2017 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2017)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Daniel D. Dydzak (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

2 #1

Standing Order

#2

(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2017 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 1st Century Bancshares, Inc., 1st Century Bank, N.A., Jeffrey L. Bleich, Consuelo M. Callahan, Tani Canti-Sakauye, John C. Coughenour, Molly C. Dwyer, Eric M. George, Ronald M. George, Kiry Gray, Ellen S. Huvelle, Edward Leavy, McKinsey and Company, Virginia A. Phillips, Manuel Lawrence Real, Matthew C. Rogers, Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, Alan Rothenberg, Charles Schwab, Milan D. Smith, Jr, Cynthia A. Snyder, Sidney R. Thomas, United States of America, Robert H. Whaley, Claudia Ann Wilken, Steven V. Wilson (Filing fee $ 400, receipt no. 34611126437). Filed byDaniel D. Dydzak. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017) Modified on 8/8/2017 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to 1st Century Bancshares, Inc., 1st Century Bank, N.A., Jeffrey L. Bleich, Consuelo M. Callahan, Tani Canti-Sakauye, John C. Coughenour, Molly C. Dwyer, Eric M. George, Ronald M. George, Kiry Gray, Ellen S. Huvelle, Edward Leavy, McKinsey and Company, Virginia A. Phillips, Manuel Lawrence Real, Matthew C. Rogers, Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, Alan Rothenberg, Charles Schwab, Milan D. Smith, Jr, Cynthia A. Snyder, Sidney R. Thomas, United States of America, Robert H. Whaley, Claudia Ann Wilken, Steven V. Wilson. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017) Modified on 8/8/2017 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Daniel D. Dydzak (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2017 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 1st Century Bancshares, Inc., 1st Century Bank, N.A., Jeffrey L. Bleich, Consuelo M. Callahan, Tani Canti-Sakauye, John C. Coughenour, Molly C. Dwyer, Eric M. George, Ronald M. George, Kiry Gray, Ellen S. Huvelle, Edward Leavy, McKinsey and Company, Virginia A. Phillips, Manuel Lawrence Real, Matthew C. Rogers, Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, Alan Rothenberg, Charles Schwab, Milan D. Smith, Jr, Cynthia A. Snyder, Sidney R. Thomas, United States of America, Robert H. Whaley, Claudia Ann Wilken, Steven V. Wilson (Filing fee $ 400, receipt no. 34611126437). Filed byDaniel D. Dydzak. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017) Modified on 8/8/2017 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES is a litigant