This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2018 at 07:54:44 (UTC).

Dwyer v. CD's Machine, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 Dwyer filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CD's Machine, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00328

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christine Dwyer

Defendants

CD's Machine, Inc.

Calvin Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ron Wright

Attorney at Wright Stout & Wilburn

Po Box 707

Muskogee, OK 74402

Defendant Attorney

Alex C. Wilson

Attorney at Brennan & Wilson, PLLC

Po Box 1067

Muskogee, OK 74402

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting scheduling order date(s): Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 12/4/2018. Exhibit List due by 2/20/2019. Witness List due by 2/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2019. Discovery due by 4/1/2019. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 4/18/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/18/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#16

(#16) MINUTES of Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/19/2018. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#15

(#15) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Christine Dwyer (Wright, Ron) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by CD's Machine, Inc., Calvin Smith (Wilson, Alex) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CD's Machine, Inc., Calvin Smith by Christine Dwyer (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Defendants; Responses due by 11/8/2018(Wilson, Alex) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

12 #1

Plaintiff's Consent Form

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

12 #2

Defendants' Consent Form

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CD's Machine, Inc. (Wilson, Alex) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alex C. Wilson on behalf of CD's Machine, Inc., Calvin Smith (Wilson, Alex) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

8 #1

Consent/Reassignment Form

#8

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/19/2018 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CD's Machine, Inc. - Served on 10/4/2018. by Christine Dwyer (Wright, Ron) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Calvin Smith - Served on 10/4/2018. by Christine Dwyer (Wright, Ron) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Calvin Smith (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CD's Machine, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 10/9/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting scheduling order date(s): Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 12/4/2018. Exhibit List due by 2/20/2019. Witness List due by 2/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2019. Discovery due by 4/1/2019. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 4/18/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/18/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTES of Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/19/2018. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Christine Dwyer (Wright, Ron) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by CD's Machine, Inc., Calvin Smith (Wilson, Alex) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint/Petition (Re: #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer). Accordingly, defendants CD's Machine, Inc. and Calvin Smith have until 11/8/2018 to file their answer or otherwise plead. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CD's Machine, Inc. (Wilson, Alex) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Defendants; Responses due by 11/8/2018(Wilson, Alex) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alex C. Wilson on behalf of CD's Machine, Inc., Calvin Smith (Wilson, Alex) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/19/2018 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CD's Machine, Inc. - Served on 10/4/2018. by Christine Dwyer (Wright, Ron) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Calvin Smith - Served on 10/4/2018. by Christine Dwyer (Wright, Ron) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Calvin Smith (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CD's Machine, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/2/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1211483 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Christine Dwyer (Wright, Ron) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 10/9/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CD's Machine, Inc., Calvin Smith by Christine Dwyer (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Christine Dwyer (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.