This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:57:00 (UTC).

Durrant et al v. Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Durrant filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00352

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexandra Teixeira

Michelle Durrant

Lisa Clemmer

Amanda Hipsky

Defendant

Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James W Friauf

Attorney at Law Office of James W. Friauf, PLLC

9724 Kingston Pike, Suite 104

Knoxville, TN 37922

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob Sterling Gibson

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Knox)

265 Brookview Centre Way, Suite 600

Knoxville, TN 37919

J Randall Patterson

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Knox)

265 Brookview Centre Way, Suite 600

Knoxville, TN 37919

 

Court Documents

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Right-to-sue Letter (Teixeira)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexandra Teixeira, Michelle Durrant, Lisa Clemmer, Amanda Hipsky. Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC waiver sent on 8/30/2018. (Friauf, James) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3753420.), filed by Alexandra Teixeira, Michelle Durrant, Lisa Clemmer, Amanda Hipsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC charge (Durrant), #2 Exhibit 2 - Right-to-sue Letter (Durrant), #3 Exhibit 3 - EEOC charge (Hipsky), #4 Exhibit 4 - Right-to-sue Letter (Hipsky), #5 Exhibit 5 - EEOC charge (Clemmer), #6 Exhibit 6 - Right-to-sue Letter (Clemmer), #7 Exhibit 7 - EEOC charge (Teixeira), #8 Exhibit 8 - Right-to-sue Letter (Teixeira), #9 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Friauf, James) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - EEOC charge (Hipsky)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on August 27, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Right-to-sue Letter (Hipsky)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on August 27, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Right-to-sue Letter (Durrant)

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - EEOC charge (Teixeira)

1 #9

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - EEOC charge (Durrant)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Sterling Gibson on behalf of Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC (Gibson, Jacob) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Right-to-sue Letter (Clemmer)

#2

(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on August 27, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - EEOC charge (Clemmer)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexandra Teixeira, Michelle Durrant, Lisa Clemmer, Amanda Hipsky. Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC waiver sent on 8/30/2018. (Friauf, James) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Sterling Gibson on behalf of Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC (Gibson, Jacob) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on August 27, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on August 27, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on August 27, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC. (RLK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (RLK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Knoxville Comprehensive Breast Center, PLLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3753420.), filed by Alexandra Teixeira, Michelle Durrant, Lisa Clemmer, Amanda Hipsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC charge (Durrant), #2 Exhibit 2 - Right-to-sue Letter (Durrant), #3 Exhibit 3 - EEOC charge (Hipsky), #4 Exhibit 4 - Right-to-sue Letter (Hipsky), #5 Exhibit 5 - EEOC charge (Clemmer), #6 Exhibit 6 - Right-to-sue Letter (Clemmer), #7 Exhibit 7 - EEOC charge (Teixeira), #8 Exhibit 8 - Right-to-sue Letter (Teixeira), #9 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Friauf, James) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.