This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2018 at 07:55:36 (UTC).

Duncan v. Entzel

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 Duncan filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Entzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael John Aloi and Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cody Duncan

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

Frederick Entzel

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Envelope

11 #1

Cover letter

#11

(#11) Election by Petitioner to Proceed Under 28 USC 2255 or to Proceed as Filed re #5 Notification filed by Cody Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(mh) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#10

(#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#9

(#9) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/10/18. (mh) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

8 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. The Court grants the Petitioner's #6 Motion to Dismiss and Denies as moot the Petitioner's #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. This action is dismissed without prejudice and stricken from the Court's active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/11/18. (Copy to PS Petitioner via cert. mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Cody Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

5 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

5 #1

Election Form

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION TO PETITIONER OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO PROCEED UNDER 28 USC 2255 OR TO PROCEED AS FILED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/5/18. (Attachments: #1 Election Form)(mh) (Copy to PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

4 #2

First page of PTAR

4 #1

First page of IFP Form

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Deficient Pleading. (Attachments: #1 First page of IFP Form, #2 First page of PTAR) (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Five Page Limitation by Cody Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Election by Petitioner to Proceed Under 28 USC 2255 or to Proceed as Filed re #5 Notification filed by Cody Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(mh) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/10/18. (mh) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. The Court grants the Petitioner's #6 Motion to Dismiss and Denies as moot the Petitioner's #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. This action is dismissed without prejudice and stricken from the Court's active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/11/18. (Copy to PS Petitioner via cert. mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice of Deficient Pleading, #3 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/7/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Cody Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTIFICATION TO PETITIONER OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO PROCEED UNDER 28 USC 2255 OR TO PROCEED AS FILED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/5/18. (Attachments: #1 Election Form)(mh) (Copy to PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Deficient Pleading. (Attachments: #1 First page of IFP Form, #2 First page of PTAR) (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Five Page Limitation by Cody Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241 against Frederick Entzel, filed by Cody Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Cody Duncan, #3 Envelope)(mh) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less