This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/28/2022 at 16:21:15 (UTC).

DUNBAR et al v. EVINE LIVE, INC

Case Summary

On 11/21/2017 DUNBAR filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against EVINE LIVE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Arthur J. Schwab. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-01527

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Schwab

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RACHEL GNIEWKOWSKI

LYNDON DUNBAR

Consolidated Plaintiffs

ROBERT JAHODA

DAVID NEW

TOMMY BROWN

ANTOINETTE SUCHENKO

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin J. Sweet

Kevin W. Tucker

Other Attorneys

Marcia L. DePaula

Daniel V. Johns

Olabisi L. Okubadejo

John R. Merinar

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#215

#213

#212

#211

#208

#206

#205

8 #2

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#5

4 #1

Proposed Consent Decree

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Summons for Evine Live, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

253 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#216) ORDER APPROVING #215 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Brown v. Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/9/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#215) STIPULATION of Dismissal (as to Brown v. Yeti Coolers, LLC, Member Case No. 17cv1551) by TOMMY BROWN. (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#214) ORDER APPROVING #213 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by TOMMY BROWN and Re/Max Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 6/12/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#213) STIPULATION of Dismissal (as to Brown v. Re/Max, LLC, Member Case No. 17cv1582) by TOMMY BROWN. (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#212) ORDER Granting #211 Stipulation of Dismissal for TOMMY BROWN, ET AL. V. PEAK RESORTS, INC. filed by TOMMY BROWN, DAVID NEW Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/25/18. (ms) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#211) STIPULATION of Dismissal (as to Brown, et al v. Peak Resorts, Inc., Member Case No. 17cv1545) by TOMMY BROWN, DAVID NEW. (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#210) ORDER APPROVING #205 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ANTOINETTE SUCHENKO and Defendant, eBags, Inc. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/24/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#209) TEXT ORDER APPROVING #208 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ANTOINETTE SUCHENKO and KYLIE JENNER, INC. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/23/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#208) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANTOINETTE SUCHENKO (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#207) ORDER approving #206 Stipulation of Dismissal of Brown v. Coldwell Banker Real Estate filed by TOMMY BROWN Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/11/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
210 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in Alternative, Transfer Venue by SNOW TIME INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Hoyt, Donald) Modified on 12/19/2017 ERROR: MULTIPLE RELIEF DOCUMENT FILED AS ONE RELIEF; RE-FILED BY COURT. (ksa) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney Donald B. Hoyt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4564258) by SNOW TIME INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hoyt, Donald) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Approved Consent Decree between Plaintiffs Teagal & Jahoda and Defendant Haverty's Furniture Companies, Inc. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 12/18/17. (lck) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER Pursuant to this Courts ADR Policies and Procedures, counsel and the parties are encouraged, prior to the scheduled ICMC of 3/14/18, to mediate this case before Arthur H. Stroyd, who successfully mediated approximately 70 similar cases to date. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 12/15/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management set for 3/14/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order and ADR Stipulations are due 2/1/18. Counsel for Plaintiffs is hereby directed to immediately serve the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference together with the Complaint upon Defendants or Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 12/15/17. (lck) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Proposed Consent Decree by ROBERT JAHODA, DECHARLEUNO TEAGAL (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree) (Carlson, R.) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Tucker on behalf of TOMMY BROWN, LYNDON DUNBAR, RACHEL GNIEWKOWSKI, ROBERT JAHODA, DAVID NEW, ANTOINETTE SUCHENKO, DECHARLEUNO TEAGAL. (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER of Consolidation: Civil Action Nos. 17-1528, 17-1532, 17-1541, 17-1542, 17-1545, 17-1551, 17-1552, 17-1558, 17-1561, 17-1571, 17-1582, 17-1597, 17-1603, 17-1604, 17-1614, and 17-1615 are hereby consolidated with Civil Action No. 17-1527, the lead case. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 12/15/17. (lck) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued as to EVINE LIVE, INC. (ksa) (Entered: 11/22/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction Requiring Changes to Corporate Policy and the Elimination of Digital Access Barriers Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 12188(a)(2) against EVINE LIVE, INC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4538221), filed by LYNDON DUNBAR, RACHEL GNIEWKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Evine Live, Inc.) (ksa) (Entered: 11/22/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less