This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2019 at 07:07:47 (UTC).

DSCC et al v. ERTEL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 DSCC filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against ERTEL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J FRANK and MARK E WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00526

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE

DSCC

Defendants

KENNETH W DETZNER

MICHAEL ERTEL

Intervenor Defendant

NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE

Intervenor

RON DESANTIS FOR GOVERNOR CAMPAIGN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RONALD G MEYER

Attorney at MEYER BROOKS DEMMA ETC PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

131 N Gadsden St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MARC E ELIAS

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP - WASHINGTON DC

700 13Th St Nw, Ste 700

Washington, DC 20005

JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM

Attorney at MEYER BROOKS DEMMA ETC PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

131 N Gadsden St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP - WASHINGTON DC

700 13Th Street Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

MALCOLM NOBLE MEANS

119 S Monroe St - Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

DWAYNE KENT SAFRIET

Attorney at HOPPING GREEN & SAMS PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

119 S Monroe St - Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL

Attorney at HOPPING GREEN & SAMS PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

119 S Monroe St Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

500 S Bronough Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

ASHLEY E DAVIS

Ra Gray Building, 500 South Bronough Street, Suite 100

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GARY VERGIL PERKO

119 S Monroe St - Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

ANDY V BARDOS

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

301 S Bronough St Ste 600

Tallahassee, FL 32301

GEORGE TY LEVESQUE

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

301 S Bronough St Ste 600

Tallahassee, FL 32301

DAVIS COOPER

Attorney at COOPER & KIRK PLLC - WASHINGTON DC

1523 New Hampshire Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20036

CHARLES JUSTIN COOPER

Attorney at COOPER & KIRK PLLC - WASHINGTON DC

1523 New Hampshire Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20036

JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY

Attorney at HOLTZMAN VOGEL JOSEFIAK PLLC - WARRENTON VA

45 N Hill Dr, Ste 100

Warrenton, VA 20186

Intervenor Attorneys

DANIEL RYAN RUSSELL

Attorney at JONES WALKER LLP - TALLAHASSEE

215 S Monroe Street, Suite 130

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MARC WESLEY DUNBAR

Attorney at JONES WALKER LLP - TALLAHASSEE

215 S Monroe Street, Suite 130

Tallahassee, FL 32301

WILLIAM DEAN HALL, III

Attorney at JONES WALKER LLP - TALLAHASSEE

215 S Monroe Street, Suite 130

Tallahassee, FL 32301

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#51

#50

#49

#48

#47

#46

#45

#44

#43

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

Exhibit Memorandum in Support

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit Summons

#1

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY, re #50 NOTICE of Substitution of Party. It is ordered: The Clerk is directed to substitute Michael Ertel as the Defendant in place of Kenneth W. Detzner. The parties should list Michael Ertel as the Defendant in subsequent pleadings. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 01/09/2019. (rcb) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) NOTICE of Substitution of Party by KENNETH W DETZNER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) NOTICE of Withdrawal of William C. Marra by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (COOPER, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings : Status Report due by 1/14/2019. (pll) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Secretary's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. ECF No. #47 . The motion is GRANTED. The Defendant and Defendant-Intervenor, National Republican Senatorial Committee, shall file their responsive pleadings on or before 1/31/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/20/2018. (kjw) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Secretary's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Until January 31, 2019 by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 12/21/2018 to correct(rcb). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #45 : The deadline to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference and file a joint report is extended to 1/22/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/17/18. (amm) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) STATUS REPORT and Consent Motion for Extension of Time by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DSCC. (NKWONTA, UZOMA) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER GRANTING INTERVENOR'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW. This Court has considered, without hearing, The Ron DeSantis for Governor Campaign's unopposed motion to withdraw as intervenor. ECF No. #43 . This motion is GRANTED. The Clerk shall disconnect the notice of electronic filing for withdrawing counsel. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/6/2018. (kjw) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw the RON DESANTIS FOR GOVERNOR CAMPAIGN as Intervenor. (HALL, WILLIAM) Modified on 12/6/2018 to reflect that this is an unopposed motion. (kjw) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Emergency MOTION to Intervene by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • (#9) NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/14/2018 11:00 AM EDT before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Victoria Milton McGee Courtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)***NEF PROVIDED TO MR. JAZIL*** (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE (Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/14/2018 11:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Clerk shall ensure that Mohammad Omar Jazil, counsel for Defendant, receives electronic notice of the hearing. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/13/2018. (vkm)***NEF EMAILED TO MR. JAZIL*** (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD G MEYER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MEYER, RONALD) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM on behalf of BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DSCC (BLOHM, JENNIFER) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. I disqualify myself from this case. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/13/2018. (kjw) *Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE no longer assigned to case. Please use the new judge's initials for future filings: 4:18cv526-MW/MJF. (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E ELIAS on behalf of Bill Nelson for U.S. Senate, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by Bill Nelson for U.S. Senate, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against KENNETH W DETZNER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4332733.), filed by DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE, Bill Nelson for U.S. Senate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons) (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE is a litigant

Latest cases where DSCC is a litigant