This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2018 at 07:35:36 (UTC).

Driscol v. Henline et al (INMATE 1)

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 Driscol filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Henline INMATE 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Emily C. Marks and Gray M. Borden. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00882

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emily C. Marks

Referral Judge

Gray M. Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Anthony Driscol

Wetumpka, AL 36092

Defendants

Bill Franklin

Nurse Duramus

Dr. Gurley

Mike Henline

Nurse James

Captain Tuck

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Supporting Document

#1

(#11) ORDER construing doc #10 as an amendment to the complaint; ORDER granting the originally named dfts an extension to and including 12/11/2018 to file their answer and special report in compliance with the directives of the #4 order; ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 12/11/2018; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint & #10 amendment to the dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/31/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#2

(#3) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/16/2018. (Furnished: Cashier via email on 11/6/18) (alm, ) Modified on 11/6/2018 (alm, ). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/16/2018. (Furnished: Cashier via email on 11/6/18) (alm, ) Modified on 11/6/2018 (alm, ). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#4

(#11) ORDER construing doc #10 as an amendment to the complaint; ORDER granting the originally named dfts an extension to and including 12/11/2018 to file their answer and special report in compliance with the directives of the #4 order; ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 12/11/2018; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint & #10 amendment to the dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/31/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#5

(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by Wilson for Bill Franklin served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#6

(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by Wilson for Dr. Gurley served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#7

(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by Wilson for Nurse Duramus served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#8

(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by Hugh Praytor for Mike Henline served on 10/20/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#19

(#19) ORDER: it is ORDERED that this lawsuit is DISMISSED in its entirety without prejudice, with no costs taxed; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

19 #1

Civil Appeals Checklist

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Anthony Driscol. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#17

(#17) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Captain Tuck served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER construing doc #10 as an amendment to the complaint; ORDER granting the originally named dfts an extension to and including 12/11/2018 to file their answer and special report in compliance with the directives of the #4 order; ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 12/11/2018; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint & #10 amendment to the dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/31/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#16

(#16) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Nurse James served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#15

(#15) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Mike Henline served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#14

(#14) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Dr. Gurley served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#13

(#13) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Bill Franklin served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER: it is ORDERED that this lawsuit is DISMISSED in its entirety without prejudice, with no costs taxed; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Dismissal by Michael Anthony Driscol, as CONSIDERED in the Court's #19 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #18 for pdf) (alm, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Anthony Driscol. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Captain Tuck served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Nurse James served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Mike Henline served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Dr. Gurley served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Bill Franklin served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #10 Amendment, & #11 Order signed by Demetrius Hooks for Nurse Duramus served on 11/2/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER construing doc #10 as an amendment to the complaint; ORDER granting the originally named dfts an extension to and including 12/11/2018 to file their answer and special report in compliance with the directives of the #4 order; ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 12/11/2018; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint & #10 amendment to the dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/31/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Nurse Duramus, Bill Franklin, Dr. Gurley, Mike Henline, Nurse James, filed by Michael Anthony Driscol.(alm, ) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by Wilson for Nurse James served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by Hugh Praytor for Mike Henline served on 10/20/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by Wilson for Nurse Duramus served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by Wilson for Dr. Gurley served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by Wilson for Bill Franklin served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 11/28/2018; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint to the dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/16/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/16/2018. (Furnished: Cashier via email on 11/6/18) (alm, ) Modified on 11/6/2018 (alm, ). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Michael Anthony Driscol. (beh, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Nurse Duramus, Bill Franklin, Dr. Gurley, Mike Henline, Nurse James, filed by Michael Anthony Driscol. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document)(beh, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.