This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2018 at 07:06:57 (UTC).

Dozier Law Firm LLC v. Gray Television, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Dozier Law Firm LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Gray Television, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05392

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dozier Law Firm LLC

Defendants

Tribune Media Company

Gray Television, Inc

Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.

Hearst Communications

Nexstar Media Group, Inc.

Tegna Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Nicholas Boley

Attorney at Wexler Wallace Llp

55 W. Monroe St., Ste. 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Bethany R. Turke

Attorney at Wexler Wallace Llp

55 W. Monroe St., Ste. 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Kenneth A. Wexler

Attorney at Wexler Wallace LLP

55 West Monroe, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Michelle J. Looby

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 So. 6Th St., Ste. 2600, Canadian Pacific Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Mark Richard Miller

Attorney at Wexler Wallace LLP

55 W. Monroe Street, #3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

William B. Michael

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Jay Cohen

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Gerald P Meyer

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

300 N. Lasalle St., Ste. 5350

Chicago, IL 60654

Daniel H. Levi

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Anita K. Mazda

Attorney at Cooley LLP

4401 Eastgate Mall

San Diego, CA 62121

Mazda K Antia

Attorney at Cooley Godward Kronish LLP

4401 Eastgate Mall

San Diego, CA 92121

Lisa Michelle Mazzone

Attorney at Figliulo & Silverman, P.C.

10 South Lasalle Street, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60603

Peter A. Silverman

Attorney at Figliulo & Silverman

Ten South Lasalle Street, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60603

Jerome Steven Fortinsky

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling, Llp

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Julie North

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue, Suite 3900

New York, NY 10019-7415

James H. Mutchnik

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Eliot A. Adelson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

29Th Floor, 555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Nathaniel Kenneth Sinnott Wackman

Attorney at Jenner & Block Llp

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Ross Benjamin Bricker

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Sally Kristen Sears Coder

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 9/7/2018. Parties' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond and comply with Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program deadlines #34 is granted. Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program requirements are stayed. Status hearing set for 11/8/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#47

(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Michelle J. Looby's Motion to appear pro hac vice #41 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#46

(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Julie North's Motion to appear pro hac vice #36 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#45

(#45) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tegna Inc by Nathaniel Kenneth Sinnott Wackman (Wackman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#44

(#44) ANSWER to Complaint by Tegna Inc(Bricker, Ross) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#43

(#43) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gray Television, Inc(Antia, Mazda) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#42

(#42) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dozier Law Firm LLC by Mark Richard Miller (Miller, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#41

(#41) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14917052. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#36

(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Julie North's Motion to appear pro hac vice #36 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#34

(#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 9/7/2018. Parties' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond and comply with Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program deadlines #34 is granted. Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program requirements are stayed. Status hearing set for 11/8/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tegna Inc by Ross Benjamin Bricker (Bricker, Ross) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 11/16/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DOZIER LAW FIRM LLC by Justin Nicholas Boley (Boley, Justin) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DOZIER LAW FIRM LLC by Bethany R. Turke (Turke, Bethany) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DOZIER LAW FIRM LLC by Kenneth A. Wexler (Wexler, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by DOZIER LAW FIRM LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14796332. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wexler, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 9/7/2018. Parties' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond and comply with Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program deadlines #34 is granted. Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program requirements are stayed. Status hearing set for 11/8/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Michelle J. Looby's Motion to appear pro hac vice #41 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Julie North's Motion to appear pro hac vice #36 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tegna Inc by Nathaniel Kenneth Sinnott Wackman (Wackman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ANSWER to Complaint by Tegna Inc(Bricker, Ross) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gray Television, Inc(Antia, Mazda) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dozier Law Firm LLC by Mark Richard Miller (Miller, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14917052. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tribune Media Company by Gerald P Meyer as Local Counsel (Meyer, Gerald) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Motion hearing set for 9/7/2018 at 9:30 AM. (TIME CHANGE ONLY). Mailed notice. notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tegna Inc by Ross Benjamin Bricker (Bricker, Ross) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 11/16/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Hearst Communications, Nexstar Media Group, Inc. (jjr, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Gray Television, Inc, Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc., Tegna Inc, Tribune Media Company (dal, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (dal, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DOZIER LAW FIRM LLC by Justin Nicholas Boley (Boley, Justin) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DOZIER LAW FIRM LLC by Bethany R. Turke (Turke, Bethany) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DOZIER LAW FIRM LLC by Kenneth A. Wexler (Wexler, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by DOZIER LAW FIRM LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14796332. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wexler, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hearst Communications is a litigant

Latest cases where SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRIBUNE MEDIA NET INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Cohen