This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:36:23 (UTC).

Dorrell v. Consolidated Glass & Mirror Trucking, LLC et al (TV3)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Dorrell filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Consolidated Glass Mirror Trucking, LLC TV3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Kirby Dorrell

Defendants

David Allen Wilson

Consolidated Glass & Mirror Trucking, LLC

110 Jack Guynn Drive

Galax, VA 24333

State of Tennessee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Morgan G Adams

Attorney at Truck Wreck Justice, PLLC

1419 Market Street

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Danny R Ellis

Attorney at Truck Wreck Justice, PLLC

1419 Market Street

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorney

Kimberly C. Sheridan

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP (GA)

3455 Peachtree Street, Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted by William Kirby Dorrell as to David Allen Wilson. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney, Kimberly C. Sheridan is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG, )Notice mailed to Sheridan. (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by William Kirby Dorrell. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Kirby Dorrell. Consolidated Glass & Mirror Trucking, LLC served on 9/11/2018. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Kirby Dorrell. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#8

(#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA :Wrong Event used. Please refile using correct event. I.e Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, and Summons Returned Executed (non-USA). Requirements due by 9/4/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Kirby Dorrell. State of Tennessee served on 8/17/2018. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/10/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/10/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/10/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel, Informational only. Address information should not have been entered and summons should not be submitted in a fillable format. (JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

2 #2

Summons State of Tennessee

2 #1

Summons David Allen Wilson

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Consolidated Glass & Mirror Trucking, LLC, State of Tennessee, David Allen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons David Allen Wilson, #2 Summons State of Tennessee)(JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

1 #3

Summons State of Tennessee

1 #2

Summons David Allen Wilson

1 #1

Summons Consolidated Glass & Mirror

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Consolidated Glass & Mirror Trucking, LLC, David Allen Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3740123.), filed by William Kirby Dorrell. (Attachments: #1 Summons Consolidated Glass & Mirror, #2 Summons David Allen Wilson, #3 Summons State of Tennessee, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted by William Kirby Dorrell as to David Allen Wilson. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have up to and including October 23, 2018 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10-3-18.This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. (KMG, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney, Kimberly C. Sheridan is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG, )Notice mailed to Sheridan. (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by William Kirby Dorrell. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Kirby Dorrell. Consolidated Glass & Mirror Trucking, LLC served on 9/11/2018. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Kirby Dorrell. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA :Wrong Event used. Please refile using correct event. I.e Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, and Summons Returned Executed (non-USA). Requirements due by 9/4/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Kirby Dorrell. State of Tennessee served on 8/17/2018. (Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/10/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/10/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/10/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel, Informational only. Address information should not have been entered and summons should not be submitted in a fillable format. (JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Consolidated Glass & Mirror Trucking, LLC, State of Tennessee, David Allen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons David Allen Wilson, #2 Summons State of Tennessee)(JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Consolidated Glass & Mirror Trucking, LLC, David Allen Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3740123.), filed by William Kirby Dorrell. (Attachments: #1 Summons Consolidated Glass & Mirror, #2 Summons David Allen Wilson, #3 Summons State of Tennessee, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Morgan) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less