This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:51:45 (UTC).

Dooley v. MB Industries, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Dooley filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against MB Industries, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth E Foote and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01039

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth E Foote

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Appellant

David M Dooley, Sr

Appellees

MBI Global, LLC

BKLC, LLC

Carmel Enterprises L L C

MBI Construction and Logistics Services, LLC

Gert Lessing

MB Industries, LLC

Hallwood Financial Ltd

Anthony Gumbiner

Hallwood Modular Buildings L L C

X-Treme Doors L L C

Carmel Foods L L C

Frederick J Gossen

The Carmel Group, Inc.

M B I Construction & Logistics Services L L C

B K L C L L C

M B I Global L L C

Carmel Group Inc

M B Industries L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Gerald C Delaunay

Attorney at Perrin Landry deLaunay

P O Box 53597

Lafayette, LA 70505

Appellee Attorneys

Timothy Russell Wynn

Attorney at Blanchard Walker et al

P O Drawer 1126

Shreveport, LA 71163-1126

Frank J Wright

Attorney at Foley Gardere (DAL)

2021 Mckinney Ave Ste 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Curtis R Shelton

Attorney at Ayres Shelton et al

P O Box 1764

Shreveport, LA 71166-1764

W Michael Adams

Attorney at Blanchard Walker et al

P O Drawer 1126

Shreveport, LA 71163-1126

B Slattery Johnson, Jr

Attorney at Blanchard Walker et al

P O Drawer 1126

Shreveport, LA 71163-1126

Robert W Johnson

Attorney at Blanchard Walker et al

P O Drawer 1126

Shreveport, LA 71163-1126

John S Hodge

Attorney at Wiener Weiss & Madison

P O Box 21990

Shreveport, LA 71120-1990

Seth Michael Moyers

Attorney at Wiener Weiss & Madison

P O Box 21990

Shreveport, LA 71120-1990

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines regarding Bankruptcy Appeal; extending brief to be filed on or before 11/12/2018. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/24/2018. (crt,Keifer, K) Modified on 9/27/2018 to edit text (Putch, A). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

6 #1

Proposed order

#6

(#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Briefing Deadlines regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal with consent by David M Dooley, Sr. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Delaunay, Gerald) Modified on 9/21/2018 to more accurately identify the pleading submitted (Putch, A). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

1 #1

AP Memorandum-Opinion Appealed

1 #2

AP Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal

1 #3

AP Docket Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 8/1/2018 signed by Bankruptcy Judge Jeffrey P Norman filed by David M Dooley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 AP Memorandum-Opinion Appealed, #2 AP Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #3 AP Docket Sheet)(Attorney Gerald C Delaunay added to party David M Dooley, Sr(pty:a))(crt,Rodgers, S) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Setting #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

4 #1

BK Docs 546, 577 from 14BK-12416

4 #2

BK Doc POC 42 from 14BK-12416

4 #3

BK Docket Sheet

#4

(#4) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by M B Industries L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docs 546, 577 from 14BK-12416, #2 BK Doc POC 42 from 14BK-12416, #3 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Gray, J) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

3 #5

BK DOC 15 (15AP-1005)

#3

(#3) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by David M Dooley, Sr (Attachments: #1 BK DOCS 1, 2, 10 (15AP-1005), #2 BK DOC 11 Main Document (15AP-1005), #3 BK DOC 11 Exhibit A (15AP-1005), #4 BK DOC 11 Exhibit (15AP-1005), #5 BK DOC 15(15AP-1005), #6 BK DOC 58(15AP-1005), #7 BK DOCS 100, 176, 204, 249, 250, 275, 276, 283, 315, 323 (15AP-1005), #8 BK DOCS 375, 376, 377, 381 (15AP-1005), #9 BK DOC 383 (15AP-1005), #10 BK DOCS 387, 388, 389, 391, 393, 394 (15AP-1005), #11 BK Docket sheet (15AP-1005), #12 BK DOCS 237, 238, 254 (14BK-12416), #13 BK DOCS 302, 487, 488, 532 (14BK-12416), #14 BK DOCS 539, 540, 542 (14BK-12416), #15 BK DOCS 572, 579 (14BK-12416), #16 BK Docket sheet (14BK-12416))(crt,Jones, R) Modified on 9/7/2018 to edit text (Putch, A). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

3 #3

BK DOC 11 EXHIBIT A (15AP-1005)

3 #2

BK DOC 11 Main Document (15AP-1005)

3 #1

BK DOCS 1, 2, 10 (15AP-1005)

3 #6

BK DOC 58 (15AP-1005)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadline per #7 Order: Appellant Brief due by 11/12/2018. (crt,Putch, A) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines regarding Bankruptcy Appeal; extending brief to be filed on or before 11/12/2018. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/24/2018. (crt,Keifer, K) Modified on 9/27/2018 to edit text (Putch, A). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions Transferred regarding #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Briefing Deadlines regarding Bankruptcy Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Briefing Deadlines regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal with consent by David M Dooley, Sr. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Delaunay, Gerald) Modified on 9/21/2018 to more accurately identify the pleading submitted (Putch, A). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Setting #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on appeal. (crt,Gray, J) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by M B Industries L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docs 546, 577 from 14BK-12416, #2 BK Doc POC 42 from 14BK-12416, #3 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Gray, J) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by David M Dooley, Sr (Attachments: #1 BK DOCS 1, 2, 10 (15AP-1005), #2 BK DOC 11 Main Document (15AP-1005), #3 BK DOC 11 Exhibit A (15AP-1005), #4 BK DOC 11 Exhibit (15AP-1005), #5 BK DOC 15(15AP-1005), #6 BK DOC 58(15AP-1005), #7 BK DOCS 100, 176, 204, 249, 250, 275, 276, 283, 315, 323 (15AP-1005), #8 BK DOCS 375, 376, 377, 381 (15AP-1005), #9 BK DOC 383 (15AP-1005), #10 BK DOCS 387, 388, 389, 391, 393, 394 (15AP-1005), #11 BK Docket sheet (15AP-1005), #12 BK DOCS 237, 238, 254 (14BK-12416), #13 BK DOCS 302, 487, 488, 532 (14BK-12416), #14 BK DOCS 539, 540, 542 (14BK-12416), #15 BK DOCS 572, 579 (14BK-12416), #16 BK Docket sheet (14BK-12416))(crt,Jones, R) Modified on 9/7/2018 to edit text (Putch, A). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Michael Moyers on behalf of M B Industries L L C (Attorney Seth Michael Moyers added to party M B Industries L L C(pty:e)) (aty,Moyers, Seth) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 8/1/2018 signed by Bankruptcy Judge Jeffrey P Norman filed by David M Dooley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 AP Memorandum-Opinion Appealed, #2 AP Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #3 AP Docket Sheet)(Attorney Gerald C Delaunay added to party David M Dooley, Sr(pty:a))(crt,Rodgers, S) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.