This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 08:03:12 (UTC).

Donahue v. Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Donahue filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01017

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley L Donahue

Defendant

Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Howard P. Elliott, Jr.

1278 Tara Boulevard

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Christopher R. Schwartz

2901 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 204

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorney

Matthew W. Pryor

Attorney at Pujol Pryor & Irwin, LLC

12320 La. Highway 44, Building 4 Suite C

Gonzales, LA 70734

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER: Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. and PNK (Baton Rouge) Partnership shall file, within 7 days of this Notice and Order, a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Notice of Removal that adequately alleges Plaintiff's citizenship. No further leave of court is required to file the Motion to Substitute. Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. and PNK (Baton Rouge) Partnership shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met, within 10 days of this Notice and Order. Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met; or (2) a Motion to Remand within 10 days after the filing of the Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. and PNK (Baton Rouge) Partnership's memorandum regarding the amount in controversy. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/30/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

4 #1

Proposed Pleading; Proposed pleading

#4

(#4) MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed pleading)(Pryor, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION to Substitute Counsel of Record by Ashley L Donahue. (Elliott, Howard) Modified on 12/6/2018 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand by Ashley L Donahue. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Schwartz, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

1 #4

Attachment Discovery responses

1 #3

Attachment Supplemental and amending petition

1 #2

Attachment Petition for damages filed in state court

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Plaintiff's motion to remand)(Pryor, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

5 #1

Attachment Plaintiff's motion to remand

#2

(#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/20/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 674490. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1863292), filed by PNK (Baton Rouge) Partnership, Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Petition for damages filed in state court, #3 Attachment Supplemental and amending petition, #4 Attachment Discovery responses)(Pryor, Matthew) Modified on 12/7/2018 to substitute removal as per Order #7 (LLH). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #9 Motion to Remand, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Remand by Ashley L Donahue. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Schwartz, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER denying #6 Joint Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(13). Although titled a "Joint Motion" the motion is not signed by the counsel seeking to withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/13/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Joint MOTION to Substitute Counsel of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: The #4 Motion to Substitute Notice of Removal is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to substitute the Comprehensive Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 4-1) in the place of R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/06/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint MOTION to Substitute Counsel of Record by Ashley L Donahue. (Elliott, Howard) Modified on 12/6/2018 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Plaintiff's motion to remand)(Pryor, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed pleading)(Pryor, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE AND ORDER: Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. and PNK (Baton Rouge) Partnership shall file, within 7 days of this Notice and Order, a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Notice of Removal that adequately alleges Plaintiff's citizenship. No further leave of court is required to file the Motion to Substitute. Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. and PNK (Baton Rouge) Partnership shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met, within 10 days of this Notice and Order. Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met; or (2) a Motion to Remand within 10 days after the filing of the Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. and PNK (Baton Rouge) Partnership's memorandum regarding the amount in controversy. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/30/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/20/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 674490. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1863292), filed by PNK (Baton Rouge) Partnership, Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Petition for damages filed in state court, #3 Attachment Supplemental and amending petition, #4 Attachment Discovery responses)(Pryor, Matthew) Modified on 12/7/2018 to substitute removal as per Order #7 (LLH). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.