This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2018 at 07:51:58 (UTC).

Doe v. Shelby County Government et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Shelby County Government. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02637

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Defendants

Unknown Jailer 1

Chief Kirk Fields

Sheriff Floyd Bonner

Shelby County Government

160 North Main Street

Memphis, TN 38103

Not Classified By Court

Jimmy Moore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Curtis D. Johnson, Jr.

Attorney at Johnson & Johnson

11 South Idlewild Street

Memphis, TN 38104

Defendant Attorneys

John Marshall Jones

Attorney at Shelby County Attorney's Office

160 North Main Street, Suite 950

Memphis, TN 38103

Emmett Lee Whitwell

Attorney at Shelby County Attorney's Office

160 N. Main Street, Suite 950

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) NOTICE by Shelby County Government Defendant's Notification of Case Law Related to What Claims Can Be Alleged (proposed order submitted) (Whitwell, Emmett) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis D. Johnson, Jr on behalf of John Doe (Johnson, Curtis) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#19

(#19) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/23/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Consent Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum (proposed order submitted) by Shelby County Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Whitwell, Emmett) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/16/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#14

(#14) SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial is set for Monday, 11/4/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 10/25/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 10/16/2019. (jrs) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#12

No Description Available

10 #2

Certificate of Consultation

10 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Lt. Terry Bishop

#10

(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2018. Curtis D. Johnson, Jr. appeared for the Plaintiff. Emmett Lee Whitwell appeared for the Defense. #10 Defense Motion to Stay and Administratively Close Case was heard and denied. Parties to submit Protective Order by 10/19/2018. HIPPA release to be signed by 10/25/2018. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 11/4/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial length is indeterminate. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 10/25/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 on 10/16/2019. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Nicole Warren) (jrs) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint Answer of Defendants Shelby County Government and Sheriff Floyd Bonner to Complaint by Floyd Bonner, Shelby County Government.(Whitwell, Emmett) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Emmett Lee Whitwell on behalf of Floyd Bonner, Kirk Fields, Shelby County Government (Whitwell, Emmett) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#7

(#7) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Monday, 10/15/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit (Collective A - state court Complaint and Summonses))

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER terminating #17 Motion for Protective Order; Protective Order has already been entered **TEXT ORDER ONLY**. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/23/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE by Shelby County Government Defendant's Notification of Case Law Related to What Claims Can Be Alleged (proposed order submitted) (Whitwell, Emmett) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis D. Johnson, Jr on behalf of John Doe (Johnson, Curtis) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/23/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #17 MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Consent Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum (proposed order submitted) filed by Shelby County Government has been filed. For future reference, please note: Proposed order should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Consent Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum (proposed order submitted) by Shelby County Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Whitwell, Emmett) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Stay. See Minute Entry from 13 . Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/15/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/16/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial is set for Monday, 11/4/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 10/25/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 10/16/2019. (jrs) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2018. Curtis D. Johnson, Jr. appeared for the Plaintiff. Emmett Lee Whitwell appeared for the Defense. #10 Defense Motion to Stay and Administratively Close Case was heard and denied. Parties to submit Protective Order by 10/19/2018. HIPPA release to be signed by 10/25/2018. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 11/4/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial length is indeterminate. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 10/25/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 on 10/16/2019. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Nicole Warren) (jrs) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Stay Combined Motion and Supporting Memorandum of Defendants Shelby County Government and Sheriff Floyd Bonner to Stay Proceedings and Administratively Close the Case (proposed order submitted) by Floyd Bonner, Shelby County Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lt. Terry Bishop, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Whitwell, Emmett) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint Answer of Defendants Shelby County Government and Sheriff Floyd Bonner to Complaint by Floyd Bonner, Shelby County Government.(Whitwell, Emmett) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Emmett Lee Whitwell on behalf of Floyd Bonner, Kirk Fields, Shelby County Government (Whitwell, Emmett) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Monday, 10/15/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#6) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ATNWDC-2881309 (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kirk Fields, Floyd Bonner, Shelby County Government from Circuit Court TN (30th Judicial District), case number CT-004068-18, filed by Kirk Fields, Floyd Bonner, Shelby County Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Collective A - state court Complaint and Summonses)), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, John) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less