This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2018 at 07:43:15 (UTC).

Doe v. Penske Truck Leasing, Co. LP et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 Doe filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Penske Truck Leasing, Co LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Susan K Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00203

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendants

Penske Truck Leasing, Co. LP

Brian Neely

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paige M Lyle

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Heather Moore Collins

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Anne Hunter

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed incorrectly: requirements due by 10/23/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

2 #1

Summons Issued as to Brian Neely

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Penske Truck Leasing, Co. LP served on 10/10/2018. (Collins, Heather) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/30/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Brian Neely served on 10/22/2018. (Collins, Heather) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Penske Truck Leasing, Co. LP. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Brian Neely)(AML, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/30/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants against Jane Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3757992.), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons- Neely)(Collins, Heather) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/30/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. (Collins, Heather) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

1 #3

Summons Summons- Neely

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Summons

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Brian Neely served on 10/22/2018. (Collins, Heather) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. (Collins, Heather) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed incorrectly: requirements due by 10/23/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Penske Truck Leasing, Co. LP served on 10/10/2018. (Collins, Heather) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/30/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/30/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/30/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • (#3) FILED IN ERROR Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/30/2018. (AML, ) Modified on 8/30/2018 (AML, ). (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Penske Truck Leasing, Co. LP. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Brian Neely)(AML, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AML, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants against Jane Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3757992.), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons- Neely)(Collins, Heather) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.