This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2018 at 07:23:48 (UTC).

Doe v. Carson City et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Carson City. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are William G. Cobb and Larry R. Hicks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00428

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

Presiding Judge

Larry R. Hicks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendants

Joyce Phillips

Carson City

Jacobs Entertainment, Inc.

Jaye Phillips

Carson City, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andre M. Lagomarsino

Attorney at Lagomarsino Law

3005 W. Horizon Ridge Pkwy., #241

Henderson, NV 89052

Defendant Attorneys

Steven T. Jaffe

Attorney at Hall Jaffe & Clayton, LLP

7425 Peak Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Kent R. Robison

Attorney at Robison, Belaustegui, Sharp & Low

71 Washington Street

Reno, NV 89503

Therese Shanks

Attorney at Robison Belaustegui Sharp & Low

71 Washington Street

Reno, NV 89503

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jacobs Entertainment, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Jacobs Entertainment, Inc..(Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Therese Shanks on behalf of Defendant Carson City, City of. with Certificate of Service (Shanks, Therese) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Carson City, City of. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Robison, Kent) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss #7 Amended Complaint by Defendant Carson City, City of. Responses due by 11/6/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/7/2018. (Robison, Kent) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Jacobs Entertainment, Inc. served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Carson City, City of served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jaye Phillips. (DRM) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jane Doe. Adds and removes parties. Proof of service due by 12/26/2018.(Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Jaye Phillips by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting ECF No. #4 Motion for Leave to proceed in Pseudonym. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/10/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION For Leave to Proceed in Pseudonym by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Responses due by 9/20/2018.(Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

3 #2

Jacobs Entertainment, Inc.

3 #1

Joyce Phillips

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Joyce Phillips, #2 Jacobs Entertainment, Inc.) (DRM) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jane Doe. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jacobs Entertainment, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Jacobs Entertainment, Inc..(Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Therese Shanks on behalf of Defendant Carson City, City of. with Certificate of Service (Shanks, Therese) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Carson City, City of. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Robison, Kent) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss #7 Amended Complaint by Defendant Carson City, City of. Responses due by 11/6/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/7/2018. (Robison, Kent) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Jacobs Entertainment, Inc. served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Carson City, City of served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jaye Phillips. (DRM) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jane Doe. Adds and removes parties. Proof of service due by 12/26/2018.(Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Jaye Phillips by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting ECF No. #4 Motion for Leave to proceed in Pseudonym. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/10/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION For Leave to Proceed in Pseudonym by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Responses due by 9/20/2018.(Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Joyce Phillips, #2 Jacobs Entertainment, Inc.) (DRM) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jane Doe. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lagomarsino, Andre) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Carson City, Jacobs Entertainment, Inc., Joyce Phillips (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5226342) by Jane Doe. Proof of service due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Carson City, #3 Summons Jacobs Entertainment, Inc., #4 Summons Joyce Phillips)(Lagomarsino, Andre) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacobs Entertainment, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CARSON CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent R. Robison

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Therese Shanks