This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2015 at 01:09:38 (UTC).

Disher et al v. Tamko Building Products, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Disher filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Tamko Building Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen C. Williams and Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00740

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen C. Williams

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard Disher

Eric Kline

Dimitri Mishurov

John O'Malley

Defendant

Tamko Building Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William M. Audet

Attorney at Audet & Partners LLP

221 Main Street, Suite 1460

San Francisco, CA 94105

Theodore H. Chase

Attorney at Audet & Partners LLP

221 Main Street, Suite 1460

San Francisco, CA 94105

John J. Driscoll

Attorney at Driscoll Firm, P.C.

211 N. Broadway, Suite 2440

St. Louis, IL 63102

Joshua C. Ezrin

Attorney at Audet & Partners LLP

221 Main Street, Suite 1460

San Francisco, CA 94105

Charles J. LaDuca

Attorney at Cuneo, Gilbert & LaDuca

8120 Woodmont Ave., Suite 810

Bethesda, MD 20814

Dustin W. Massie

Attorney at Halunen & Associates

1650 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Christopher J. Quinn

Attorney at Driscoll Firm, P.C.

211 N. Broadway, Suite 2440

St. Louis, IL 63102

Robert K Shelquist

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401-2179

Brendan Thompson

Attorney at Cuneo, Gilbert & LaDuca

8120 Woodmont Ave., Suite 810

Bethesda, MD 20814

Melissa Weiner Wolchansky

Attorney at Halunen & Associates

1650 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Laura Bailey Brown

Attorney at Carmody MacDonald PC

120 South Central Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

John H. Beisner

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, et al. - DC

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Richard T Bernardo

Attorney at Skadden, Arps et al. - New York

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

David H. Luce

Attorney at Carmody, MacDonald et al.

120 S. Central, Suite 1800

Clayton, MO 63105

John Daniel McAnnar

Attorney at Carmody MacDonald PC

120 South Central Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Jessica Miller

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, et al. - DC

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

David P. Stoeberl

Attorney at Carmody MacDonald PC

120 South Central Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Thomas E. Fox

Attorney at Skadden, Arps et al. - New York

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Adam Tubbs

Attorney at Skadden, Arps et al. - New York

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#91

(#91) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims of Plaintiff Dimitri Mishurov by Dimitri Mishurov. (Chase, Theodore) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

#87

(#87) ORDER on Electronically Stored Information Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 3/2/2015. (anj) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#84

(#86) ORDER granting # 84 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fox; granting # 85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attornet Tubbs on behalf of Tamko Building Products, Inc. (anm) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#85

(#86) ORDER granting # 84 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fox; granting # 85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attornet Tubbs on behalf of Tamko Building Products, Inc. (anm) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#80

No Description Available

#1

(#1) Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 14-740-NJR-SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(cjo) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Tamko Building Products, Inc. and original sent to Attorney Driscoll. (anm) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

#14

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

42 #1

Exhibit 1

#42

No Description Available

#54

No Description Available

#58

No Description Available

#68

No Description Available

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2015
  • (#94) ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims (Doc. 91), all claims of Plaintiff Dimitri Mishurov against Defendants are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/17/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims of Plaintiff Dimitri Mishurov by Dimitri Mishurov. (Chase, Theodore) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re # 91 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Dimitri Mishurov. A document requiring multiple signatures should have "with consent" following the name of the non-filing signatory. Please see Section 2.0 page 2.1.of the CM/ECF Users' Manual. A proposed order is attached to the Stipulation of Dismissal. Proposed orders are to be emailed to the judge's email address. Please see Section 2.0, page 2.6 of the CM/ECF Users' Manual for further instruction. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims of Plaintiff Dimitri Mishurov by Dimitri Mishurov. (Chase, Theodore) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Flannery on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Flannery, Michael) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) ORDER GRANTING proposed protective order. Protective Order entered with modifications to paragraphs IV.A. and VI.B.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 3/13/2015. (anj) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) ORDER on Electronically Stored Information Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 3/2/2015. (anj) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • (#88) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Status Conference held on 2/27/2015. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Reset Hearings: AT the Request of the parties, the Status Conference is RESET for 2/27/2015 at 2:00 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852 ; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846 ; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467 . (amv) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) ORDER granting # 84 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fox; granting # 85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attornet Tubbs on behalf of Tamko Building Products, Inc. (anm) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyTheodore H. Chase $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2345651 by on behalf of Richard Disher. (Chase, Theodore) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyWilliam M. Audet $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2345406 by on behalf of Richard Disher, Eric Kline, Dimitri Mishurov, John O'Malley. (Audet, William) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Disher, Eric Kline, Dimitri Mishurov, John O'Malley. Tamko Building Products, Inc. served on 7/9/2014, answer due 7/30/2014; Tamko Roofing Products, Inc. served on 7/9/2014, answer due 7/30/2014. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting # 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melissa Weiner Wolchansky on behalf of Richard Disher, Eric Kline, Dimitri Mishurov and John O'Malley on 7/3/2014. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyMelissa Weiner Wolchansky $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2334526 by on behalf of Richard Disher, Eric Kline, Dimitri Mishurov, John O'Malley. (Wolchansky, Melissa) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Tamko Roofing Products, Inc. and original sent to Attorney Driscoll. (anm) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Tamko Building Products, Inc. and original sent to Attorney Driscoll. (anm) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re # 2 Complaint filed by John O'Malley, Eric Kline, Dimitri Mishurov, Richard Disher. Document does not contain a case number. Pursuant to the Csse Open Notice at Document 1, case number 14-740-NJR-SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (kek) (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2330046.), filed by Richard Disher, Eric Kline, Dimitri Mishurov, John O'Malley. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Driscoll, John) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 14-740-NJR-SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(cjo) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less