This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2020 at 07:39:37 (UTC).

Dionka Banks v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Dionka Banks filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01653

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dionka Banks

Defendant

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Yeremian

Attorney at David Yeremian and Associates Inc

535 North Brand Boulevard Suite 705

Glendale, CA 91203

Kevin J Stoops

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz PC

One Towne Square Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Jason J Thompson

Attorney at Sommers Schwatz PC

One Towne Square 17Th Floor

Southfield, MI 48076

Trenton R Kashima

Attorney at Finkelstein and Krinsk LLP

550 West C Street Suite 1760

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Christian J Rowley

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Duwayne Andre Carr

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Pamela L Vartabedian

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Kerry McCoy Friedrichs

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Parnian Vafaeenia

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Candace Sheri Bertoldi

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#60

(#60) FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THIS DOCUMENT. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS, ADJUDGES AND DECREES THAT: 1. Initial-capitalized terms in this order shall have the same meaning as assigned to them in the Settlement. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. 1. GRANTS final approval of the Settlement Agreement; 2. AWARDS Class Counsel attorneys fees in the amount of $412,500; 3. AWARDS Class Counsel costs in the amount of $33,500; 4. AWARDS $5,000 to Plaintiff Dionka Banks; 5. ORDERS the payment of $18,300 to the Settlement Administrator. Related to: Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Motion for Settlement #59 . (twdb) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#59

(#59) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt. No. #54 ); and (2) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees (Dkt. No. #53 ). For the reasons stated above, the Court: 1. GRANTS final approval of the Settlement Agreement; 2. AWARDS Class Counsel attorneys fees in the amount of $412,500; 3. AWARDS Class Counsel costs in the amount of $33,500; 4. AWARDS $5,000 to Plaintiff Dionka Banks; 5. ORDERS the payment of $18,300 to the Settlement Administrator; and 6. DISMISSES the Complaint WITH PREJUDICE. The Court ORDERS such judgment be entered. (twdb) Modified on 9/13/2019 (twdb). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

54 #4

Proposed Order

#54

(#54) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class/Collection Action [Final Approval] filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A- Declaration of Stoops, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kincannon, #4 Proposed Order) (Stoops, Kevin) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

53 #6

Proposed Order

53 #5

Exhibit D - Laffey Matrix

53 #4

Exhibit C - Declaration of Trent Kashima

53 #3

Exhibit B - Declaration of David Yeremian

53 #2

Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Stoops

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J Stoops. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks, identifying Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Yeremian, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks. (Yeremian, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks. (Yeremian, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THIS DOCUMENT. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS, ADJUDGES AND DECREES THAT: 1. Initial-capitalized terms in this order shall have the same meaning as assigned to them in the Settlement. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. 1. GRANTS final approval of the Settlement Agreement; 2. AWARDS Class Counsel attorneys fees in the amount of $412,500; 3. AWARDS Class Counsel costs in the amount of $33,500; 4. AWARDS $5,000 to Plaintiff Dionka Banks; 5. ORDERS the payment of $18,300 to the Settlement Administrator. Related to: Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Motion for Settlement #59 . (twdb) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt. No. #54 ); and (2) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees (Dkt. No. #53 ). For the reasons stated above, the Court: 1. GRANTS final approval of the Settlement Agreement; 2. AWARDS Class Counsel attorneys fees in the amount of $412,500; 3. AWARDS Class Counsel costs in the amount of $33,500; 4. AWARDS $5,000 to Plaintiff Dionka Banks; 5. ORDERS the payment of $18,300 to the Settlement Administrator; and 6. DISMISSES the Complaint WITH PREJUDICE. The Court ORDERS such judgment be entered. (twdb) Modified on 9/13/2019 (twdb). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES LITIGATION/SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION EXPENSES, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE AWARD (Dkt. No. #53 ) AND MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL OF CLASS/COLLECTION ACTION (Dkt. No. #54 ). The case is called and counsel state their appearances. The Court confers with counsel. A separate order will issue. Court Reporter: Phyllis A. Preston. (twdb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Telephonic Appearance #56 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: "Motions and Related Filings" - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests - Request. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. re Request for Telephonic Appearance at Final Approval Hearing on September 9, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rowley, Christian) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Litigation/Settlement Administration Expenses, and Class Representative Service Award #53 filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Stoops)(Stoops, Kevin) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class/Collection Action [Final Approval] filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A- Declaration of Stoops, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kincannon, #4 Proposed Order) (Stoops, Kevin) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Litigation/Settlement Administration Expenses, and Class Representative Service Award filed by Plainitffs Dionka Banks. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Stoops, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of David Yeremian, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Trent Kashima, #5 Exhibit D - Laffey Matrix, #6 Proposed Order) (Stoops, Kevin) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal Granting Plaintiff's Unoppose Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class/Collective Action Settlement (mga) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MINUTES by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order GRANTING Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt. No. #48 ). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason T Thompson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J Stoops. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks, identifying Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Yeremian, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks. (Yeremian, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks. (Yeremian, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22221386 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dionka Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form) (Attorney David Yeremian added to party Dionka Banks(pty:pla))(Yeremian, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duwayne Andre Carr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Parnian Vafaeenia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pamela L Vartabedian