This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 13:44:41 (UTC).

Difatte v. Canton Mart Development, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Difatte filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Canton Mart Development, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William H. Barbour, Jr and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00532

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Barbour, Jr

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Difatte

Defendants

John Does 1-5

Canton Mart Development, LLC

Walgreens #5791

Walgreens #5791 d/b/a Walgreen Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Ashley Ogden

Attorney at OGDEN & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

500 East Capitol Street, Suite 3

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick Marvin Tatum

Attorney at UPSHAW, WILLIAMS, BIGGERS & BECKHAM, LLP - Jackson

P. O. Box 3080, 713 South Pear Orchard Road, Suite 102 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-3080

Leah Nichols Ledford

Attorney at SCOTT, SULLIVAN, STREETMAN & FOX - Jackson

P. O. Box 13847, 730 Avignon Drive, Suite 101 (39157)

Jackson, MS 39236-3847

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 Response to Motion To Strike filed by Walgreens #5791 (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Strike #6 Response to Motion Affidavit of Craig Ripley filed by Walgreens #5791 (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

9 #2

Exhibit B - Lease Agreement

9 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Craig Ripley

#9

(#9) MOTION to Strike #6 Response to Motion Affidavit of Craig Ripley by Brenda Difatte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Craig Ripley, #2 Exhibit B - Lease Agreement)(Ogden, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

8 #3

Exhibit C - Affidavit of John Tisdale

8 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Brenda DiFatta

8 #1

Exhibit A - Lease Agreement

#8

(#8) Rebuttal re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Brenda Difatte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Brenda DiFatta, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of John Tisdale, #4 Exhibit D - Complaint)(Ogden, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

6 #2

Exhibit B (Affidavit of Ripley)

6 #1

Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Complaint)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Walgreens #5791 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Affidavit of Ripley))(Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

4 #6

Exhibit Sunrise/Sunset Time Chart

4 #4

Affidavit Affidavit of John Tisdale

4 #3

Affidavit Affidavit of Brenda Difatta

4 #2

Exhibit Lease Agreement

4 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand by Brenda Difatte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Lease Agreement, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Brenda Difatta, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of John Tisdale, #5 Exhibit Incident Report, #6 Exhibit Sunrise/Sunset Time Chart)(Ogden, James) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 Response to Motion To Strike filed by Walgreens #5791 (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Strike #6 Response to Motion Affidavit of Craig Ripley filed by Walgreens #5791 (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Strike #6 Response to Motion Affidavit of Craig Ripley by Brenda Difatte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Craig Ripley, #2 Exhibit B - Lease Agreement)(Ogden, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Rebuttal re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Brenda Difatte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Brenda DiFatta, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of John Tisdale, #4 Exhibit D - Complaint)(Ogden, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 Response to Motion filed by Walgreens #5791 (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Walgreens #5791 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Affidavit of Ripley))(Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Canton Mart Development, LLC.(Tatum, Patrick) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS. Proceedings in this matter are stayed pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 16(b)(1)(B), pending briefing and ruling on Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Remand. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/31/2018 (AG) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Remand by Brenda Difatte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Lease Agreement, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Brenda Difatta, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of John Tisdale, #5 Exhibit Incident Report, #6 Exhibit Sunrise/Sunset Time Chart)(Ogden, James) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens #5791 identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreens #5791. (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Walgreens #5791.(Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreens #5791 from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 25CI1:18-cv-333-TTG. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-3779667) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lower Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Entire State Court File, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Ashley Ogden