This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2019 at 06:10:48 (UTC).

Dickson v. Former FBI Director James B. Comey Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2018 Dickson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Former FBI Director James B Comey Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Miller and Arenda L. Wright Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

Presiding Judge

Arenda L. Wright Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John M. Dickson, Jr.

Hampton, VA 23666

Defendants

Northampton Community Center

Ms. Lisa Taylor

John/Jane Doe (s) Employees

Nurse Doe Johnson of Eastern State Hospital

McDonals's Inc. John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees)

Dr. Gregory Briscoe, MD Psychiatry

Mr. Korey Ballard (employee) of Octapharma Plasma Inc.

Dr. Charles Erdman

Walmart Jane Doe (employees)

Derek Curran

Mr. John E. Smith (Owner) JSI FOODS, INC.

Doctor Hasmukh Vyas of Eastern State Hospital

City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer. J. Dye

City of Hampton Virginia Police

Social Worker, Mr. Michael Frazier of Eastern State Hospital

Director Matthew Stearn

City of Hampton Virginia police department

City of Hampton Virginia Police Officers John/Jane Doe(s)

John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees) of Farm Fresh Supermarkets

31 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) USCA Case Number 19-1430 4CCA Case Manager Cathy Tyree Herb for #14 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Dickson, Jr.(19-1430) (epri, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

15 #2

Letter

15 #1

Notice of Appeal

#15

(#15) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #14 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Letter)(epri, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

14 #1

Letter

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, ECF No. 11, is DENIED. A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 3.19.19. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 3/19/2019. (epri, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

12 #36

Exhibit 16

12 #35

Exhibit 15 Part 2

12 #34

Exhibit 15 Part 1

12 #33

Exhibit 14 Part 5

12 #32

Exhibit 14 Part 4

12 #31

Exhibit 14 Part 3

12 #30

Exhibit 14 Part 2

12 #29

Exhibit 14 Part 1

12 #28

Exhibit 13

12 #27

Exhibit 12 Part 2

12 #15

Exhibit 7

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) USCA Case Number 19-1430 4CCA Case Manager Cathy Tyree Herb for #14 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Dickson, Jr.(19-1430) (epri, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #14 Notice of Appeal (epri, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #14 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Letter)(epri, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, ECF No. 11, is DENIED. A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 3.19.19. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 3/19/2019. (epri, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT FOR RELIEF OF THE JUDGEMENT AND ORDER OF THE COURT DATED FEBRUARY 13th 2018 HAVING DISMISSED JOHN M. DICKSON, JR VS. FORMER FBI DIRECTOR JAMES B. COMEY ET,. AL, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA, NEWPORT NEWS DIVISION, CIVIL ACTION NO: 4:18-CV-00002. filed by John M. Dickson, Jr. (epri, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2019: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, #6 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #7 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #10 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #11 Exhibit 5 Part 1, #12 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #13 Exhibit 6 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 6 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #17 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #18 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #19 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #20 Exhibit 9 Part 3, #21 Exhibit 10 Part 1, #22 Exhibit 10 Part 2, #23 Exhibit 11 Part 1, #24 Exhibit 11 Part 2, #25 Exhibit 11 Part 3, #26 Exhibit 12 Part 1, #27 Exhibit 12 Part 2, #28 Exhibit 13, #29 Exhibit 14 Part 1, #30 Exhibit 14 Part 2, #31 Exhibit 14 Part 3, #32 Exhibit 14 Part 4, #33 Exhibit 14 Part 5, #34 Exhibit 15 Part 1, #35 Exhibit 15 Part 2, #36 Exhibit 16 #37 Exhibit Disc Audio & Visual files) (epri, ). (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF OF THE JUDGEMENT AND ORDER OF THE COURT DATED FEBRUARY 13 2018 HAVING DISMISSED JOHN M. DICKSON, JR VS. FORMER FBI DIRECTOR JAMES B. COMEY ET,. AL, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA, NEWPORT NEWS DIVISION, CIVIL ACTION NO: 4:18-CV-00002. by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) USCA Mandate re #5 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered 05/18/2018, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (18-1299) (epri) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) USCA JUDGMENT as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Dickson, Jr. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is affirmed. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (18-1299) (epri) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Opinion of USCA (Copy) AFFIRMED re #5 Notice of Appeal. Attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. Affirmed by unpublished per curiam opinion. (18-1299) (epri) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) USCA Case Number 18-1299 4CCA Case Mangager - Cyndi Halupa - for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Dickson, Jr.(18-1299) (epri) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #5 Notice of Appeal (epri) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #5 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Letter)(epri) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Dismissal Order by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2018.(epri) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Dr. Gregory Briscoe, MD Psychiatry, Chief of Police Mr. Terry L. Sult for the City of Hampton Virginia, City of Hampton Virginia, City of Hampton Virginia Police, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer Mr. R. Foote, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer. J. Dye, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer. Jonathan Donker, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officers John/Jane Doe(s), City of Hampton Virginia Police lieutenant. F. Edmonds, City of Hampton Virginia police Corporal Jane Doe, City of Hampton Virginia police department, City of Hampton Virginia police department records department, City of Hampton Virginia police officer Mr. Doe Squire, City of Newport News Virginia, City of Newport News Virginia Police Officers John/Jane Doe (s), Marissa Claiborne employee, Ms. Melaney Cox, Derek Curran, Director Matthew Stearn, Doctor Hasmukh Vyas of Eastern State Hospital, Dr. Charles Erdman, FBI Agent Mrs. /Ms. Katherine Andrews, FBI Newport News field office, John/Jane Doe(s) Teachnical and field agent(s), Farm Fresh Supermarkets Incorporated, Former Chief of Police of the City of Newport News Virginia Mr. Richard W. Myers, Former FBI Director James B. Comey Jr., HELP program - Volunteers John/Jane Doe(s), Hope In Home Care Personal Care Division, Jane Doe psychologist of Eastern State Hospital, John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees) of Farm Fresh Supermarkets, John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees) of Octapharma Plasma Inc., John/Jane Doe (s) Employees(In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law ), McDonals's Inc. John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees), Mr. John E. Smith (Owner) JSI FOODS, INC., Mr. Korey Ballard (employee) of Octapharma Plasma Inc., Mr. Mrs. / Ms. John, Jane Doe employee(s), Mrs. Deja Vinston (employee) of Octapharma Plasma Inc., Ms. Lisa Taylor, Ms. Najeah Easmell, Northampton Community Center, Nurse Doe Johnson of Eastern State Hospital, Regina O'Halloran, Barbara Robinson employee, Scott Rutland, Annalisa Schaeperkoetter, Shanita Smith employee, Social Worker, Mr. Michael Frazier of Eastern State Hospital, Tiffany Thompson DNP of Eastern State Hospital, Walmart Corporation, Walmart Jane Doe (employees), filed by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Complaint Part 3, #3 Complaint Part 4, #4 Letter)(epri) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISMISSAL ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's IFP Motion, ECF No. 1, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff on 2.13.18 as DIRECTED. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 2/13/2018. (epri) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint Part 1, #2 Proposed Complaint Part 2, #3 Proposed Complaint Part 3, #4 Proposed Complaint Part 4, #5 Letter)(epri) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.