This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:54 (UTC).

Diaz v. Downstate Correctional Facility et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Diaz filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Downstate Correctional Facility. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07778

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miguel Diaz

Fishkill, NY 12524

Defendants

Downstate Correctional Facility

Ms. Smith

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 10/1/2018. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 10/1/2018. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/31/18) (Attachments: #1 Supplement ifp)(bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Miguel Diaz.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

4 #1

Supplement ifp

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Downstate Correctional Facility, Smith. Document filed by Miguel Diaz.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Miguel Diaz.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Miguel Diaz DIN No. 18-A-2702 Downstate Correctional Facility Red School House Road P.O. Box F Fishkill, NY 12524. (aea) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 10/1/2018. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 10/1/2018. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/31/18) (Attachments: #1 Supplement ifp)(bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Miguel Diaz.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Downstate Correctional Facility, Smith. Document filed by Miguel Diaz.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Miguel Diaz.(sac) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less