This case was last updated from PACER on 06/24/2020 at 06:37:54 (UTC).

Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al v. Aaronson et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 Diamond Resorts International, Inc filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Aaronson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel C. Irick and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:17-CV-01394

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diamond Resorts International, Inc.

Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC

Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.

Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC

Defendants

Austin N. Aaronson

Longwood, FL 32779

Aaronson, Austin, PA.

Intervenor

Foremost Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Aaron Backman

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder, PA - Corporate

200 E Broward Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Richard W. Epstein

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder, PA - Corporate

200 E Broward Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Meredith Hamilton Leonard

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder, PA - Corporate

200 E Broward Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Olga M. Vieira

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder LLP

600 Brickell Ave., Ste. 3600

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Charles J. Meltz

Attorney at Grower, Ketcham, Eide, Telan & Meltz, P.A.

901 N Lake Destiny Rd - Ste 450, Po Box 538065

Orlando, FL 32853-8065

Stacey Jade Carlisle

Attorney at McEwan, Martinez, Dukes & Hall PA

901 N Lake Destiny Rd - Ste 450, Po Box 538065

Orlando, FL 32853-8065

Laura Marie Kelly

Attorney at Grower, Ketcham, Eide, Telan & Meltz, PA

901 N Lake Destiny Rd - Ste 450, Po Box 538065

Orlando, FL 32853-8065

Austin Neil Aaronson

Attorney at Aaronson, Austin, PA

Suite 6136, 2180 W. State Rd. 434

Longwood, FL 32779

Malcolm Patrick Galvin, III

Attorney at Galvin Law, PL

390 N Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801-1684

George Ryan Dietrich

Attorney at Grower, Ketcham, Eide, Telan & Meltz, P.A.

P.O. Box 538065

Orlando, FL 32853-8065

Intervenor Attorney

Dustin Craig Blumenthal

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP

222 Lakeview Avenue, Suite 800

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#232

(#232) ORDER granting in part #231 Motion to View Sealed Portion of Trial Transcript. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/10/2019. (ctp) (JLC) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#231

(#231) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Permission to View Sealed Portion of Trial Transcript by Austin N. Aaronson, Aaronson, Austin, PA.. (Meltz, Charles) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#229

(#229) TRANSCRIPT of Trial Volume 3 of 3 (SEALED PORTION REDACTED) held on 5/2/2019 before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter Suzanne Trimble, trimblecourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 5/31/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2019. (SLT) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#227

(#227) TRANSCRIPT of Trial Volume 2 of 3 held on 5/1/2019 before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter Suzanne Trimble, trimblecourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 5/31/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2019. (SLT) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#225

(#225) TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings Volume I held on April 30, 2019, before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter: Heather Jewett, RPR, FCRR <. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 5/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2019. (HLJ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#224

(#224) ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/7/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Management and Exchange Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc.; Corporate Parent Dakota Parent, Inc. for Diamond Resorts International, Inc... (Epstein, Richard) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

#7

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Management and Exchange Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc.; Corporate Parent Dakota Parent, Inc. for Diamond Resorts International, Inc... (Epstein, Richard) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

6 #3

Supplement

6 #2

Supplement

6 #1

Supplement

#6

(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/4/2017. (Attachments: #1, #2, #3 )(VMF)(ctp) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

#5

(#5) RETURN of service executed on 7/28/2017 by Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC as to Austin N. Aaronson. (Epstein, Richard) (Entered: 08/01/2017)

#4

(#4) RETURN of service executed on 7/28/2017 by Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC as to Aaronson, Austin, PA.. (Epstein, Richard) (Entered: 08/01/2017)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Aaronson, Austin, PA. (RMF) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS issued as to Austin N. Aaronson. (RMF) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Austin N. Aaronson, Aaronson, Austin, PA.. (Meltz, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 08/10/2017)

518 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#232) ORDER granting in part #231 Motion to View Sealed Portion of Trial Transcript. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/10/2019. (ctp) (JLC) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Permission to View Sealed Portion of Trial Transcript by Austin N. Aaronson, Aaronson, Austin, PA.. (Meltz, Charles) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Docket(#230) NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble. (SLT) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#229) TRANSCRIPT of Trial Volume 3 of 3 (SEALED PORTION REDACTED) held on 5/2/2019 before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter Suzanne Trimble, trimblecourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 5/31/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2019. (SLT) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Docket(#228) NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble. (SLT) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#227) TRANSCRIPT of Trial Volume 2 of 3 held on 5/1/2019 before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter Suzanne Trimble, trimblecourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 5/31/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2019. (SLT) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Docket(#226) NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Heather L. Jewett. (HLJ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#225) TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings Volume I held on April 30, 2019, before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter: Heather Jewett, RPR, FCRR <. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 5/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2019. (HLJ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#224) ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/7/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • Docket(#220) NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Heather L. Jewett. (HLJ) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
219 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Austin N. Aaronson, Aaronson, Austin, PA.. (Meltz, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Meltz on behalf of Austin N. Aaronson, Aaronson, Austin, PA. (Meltz, Charles) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Management and Exchange Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc.; Corporate Parent Dakota Parent, Inc. for Diamond Resorts International, Inc... (Epstein, Richard) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/4/2017. (VMF) (ctp) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/4/2017. (Attachments: #1, #2, #3 )(VMF)(ctp) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of service executed on 7/28/2017 by Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC as to Austin N. Aaronson. (Epstein, Richard) (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of service executed on 7/28/2017 by Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC as to Aaronson, Austin, PA.. (Epstein, Richard) (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Aaronson, Austin, PA. (RMF) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS issued as to Austin N. Aaronson. (RMF) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Austin N. Aaronson, Aaronson, Austin, PA. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL 65702) filed by Diamond Resorts Managemnet, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMF) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less