This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2018 at 07:20:18 (UTC).

DHSC,LLC v. ALEX M. AZAR II

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 DHSC,LLC filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against ALEX M AZAR II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01820

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DHSC,LLC

Defendant

ALEX M. AZAR II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth N. Swayne

Attorney at KING & SPALDING LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006

Daniel J. Hettich

Attorney at KING & SPALDING, LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5619059) filed by DHSC,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #7

Summons

#5

(#5) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/08/18. (DM) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/7/2018. (Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DHSC,LLC. (Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 3

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR II served on 8/7/2018 (Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N. Swayne on behalf of DHSC,LLC (Swayne, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/6/2018. (Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #1

Notice and Consent

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/7/2018. (Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/6/2018. (Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR II served on 8/7/2018 (Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/08/18. (DM) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N. Swayne on behalf of DHSC,LLC (Swayne, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DHSC,LLC. (Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5619059) filed by DHSC,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Hettich, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.