This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2018 at 07:48:51 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. de Alba-Pagan et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against de Alba-Pagan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01777

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as certificate trustee on behalf of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2017-1

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Defendants

EXPO DISPLAY CARIBBEAN, INC.

CARLOS HIRAM DE ALBA PAGAN

RUBEN GOMEZ SANTIAGO

WANDA JIMENEZ PONS

ALMA IRIS LOPEZ MENDEZ

United States of America

Wanda Jimenez-Pons

Ruben Gomez-Santiago

Alma Iris Lopez-Mendez

Carlos Hiram de Alba-Pagan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shirley Ann Palumbo

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder

525 Okeechobee Blvd., Suite 1570

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Summons

#5

#4

#3

1 #12

Affidavit SWORN STATEMENT

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 6

1 #9

Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 5

1 #8

Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 4

1 #7

Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 3

1 #6

Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 2

1 #5

Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 1

1 #4

Exhibit NOTE

1 #3

Exhibit CHANGE OF ADDRESS

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Expo Display Caribbean, Inc., Ruben Gomez-Santiago, Wanda Jimenez-Pons, Alma Iris Lopez-Mendez, United States of America, Carlos Hiram de Alba-Pagan. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits: SUMMONS re #1 COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. SUMMONS. (Palumbo, Shirley) Modified on 11/1/2018 change event (gav). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Summons submitted are incorrectly filed. (arg) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6104236.), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as certificate trustee on behalf of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2017-1. Service due by 1/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit CHANGE OF ADDRESS, #4 Exhibit NOTE, #5 Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 1, #6 Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 2, #7 Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 3, #8 Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 4, #9 Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 5, #10 Exhibit MORTGAGE PART 6, #11 Summons, #12 Affidavit SWORN STATEMENT)(Palumbo, Shirley) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shirley Ann Palumbo