This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2018 at 08:20:50 (UTC).

Detlaff v. Boss et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Detlaff filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Boss. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William E Duffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01620

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael J Dettlaff

Wauwatosa, WI 54312

Defendants

Bethany Salamone

Eric J Losee

Cari Boss

Julie Krause

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) US Marshal 285 Form returned unexecuted as to Eric J Lesee. Waiver of Service not returned or filed on Pacer. (lz)

#12

(#12) US Marshal 285 Form returned unexecuted as to Bethany Salamone. Waiver of Service not returned or filed on Pacer. (lz)

#11

(#11) US Marshal 285 Form returned unexecuted as to Julie Krause. Waiver of Service not returned or filed on Pacer. (lz)

#10

(#10) US Marshal 285 Form returned unexecuted as to Cari Boss. Waiver of Service not returned or filed on Pacer. (lz)

#9

(#9) LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed as soon as possible. (lz)

#8

(#8) ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/4/2018 ADOPTING #4 Judge Duffin's Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's access to courts claim DISMISSED. Case RETURNED to Judge Duffin for further proceedings. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michael Dettlaff)(cb)

6 #1

Attachments (bookmarked)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Michael J Dettlaff (Attachments: #1 Attachments (bookmarked))(vkb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#5

(#5) TRANSMIT Order, Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form to US Marshal for service upon defendants (vkb)

#4

(#4) ...(continued from ECF #3 ) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Michael J Dettlaff signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/18/2018. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Dettlaff's access-to-courts claim be dismissed. Written objections to any recommendation herein or part thereof may be filed within fourteen days of service of this recommendation. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(lz)

#3

(#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/18/2018 granting #2 Plaintiff Michael Dettlaff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Dettlaff may file an amended complaint with respect to his access the courts claim. The US Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this order upon defendants. (continued below)... (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff) (lz)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Michael J Dettlaff. (lz) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

1 #1

Exhibits A-F (bookmarked)

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT and STATEMENT OF FACTS against Cari Boss, Julie Krause, Bethany Salamone, Eric J Losee filed by Michael J Dettlaff. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. (lz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Exhibits A-F (bookmarked)) (lz). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) US Marshal 285 Form returned unexecuted as to Eric J Lesee. Waiver of Service not returned or filed on Pacer. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) US Marshal 285 Form returned unexecuted as to Bethany Salamone. Waiver of Service not returned or filed on Pacer. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) US Marshal 285 Form returned unexecuted as to Julie Krause. Waiver of Service not returned or filed on Pacer. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) US Marshal 285 Form returned unexecuted as to Cari Boss. Waiver of Service not returned or filed on Pacer. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed as soon as possible. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to the case. (vkb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/4/2018 ADOPTING #4 Judge Duffin's Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's access to courts claim DISMISSED. Case RETURNED to Judge Duffin for further proceedings. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michael Dettlaff)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/5/2018 re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file his amended complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 15, 2018. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michael Dettlaff) (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Michael J Dettlaff (Attachments: #1 Attachments (bookmarked))(vkb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TRANSMIT Order, Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form to US Marshal for service upon defendants (vkb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ...(continued from ECF #3 ) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Michael J Dettlaff signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/18/2018. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Dettlaff's access-to-courts claim be dismissed. Written objections to any recommendation herein or part thereof may be filed within fourteen days of service of this recommendation. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/18/2018 granting #2 Plaintiff Michael Dettlaff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Dettlaff may file an amended complaint with respect to his access the courts claim. The US Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this order upon defendants. (continued below)... (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff) (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Michael J Dettlaff. (lz) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT and STATEMENT OF FACTS against Cari Boss, Julie Krause, Bethany Salamone, Eric J Losee filed by Michael J Dettlaff. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. (lz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Exhibits A-F (bookmarked)) (lz). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.