This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2019 at 15:26:07 (UTC).

Desmith v. Verizon Wireless Services LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 Desmith filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Verizon Wireless Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio, Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Damon R Leichty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00978

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

Presiding Judges

Jon E DeGuilio

Damon R Leichty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES DESMITH

Defendants

VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC

Verizon Wireless Services LLC

Not Classified By Court

James VanWinkle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W Stewart

Attorney at Stewart & Stewart

931 S Rangeline Rd

Carmel, IN 46032

Heather R Falks

Attorney at Stewart & Stewart

931 S Rangeline Rd

Carmel, IN 46032

Darron S Stewart

Attorney at Stewart & Stewart

931 S Rangeline Rd

Carmel, IN 46032

Nicholas J Wagner

Attorney at Stewart & Stewart

931 S Rangeline Rd

Carmel, IN 46032

Cherry Malichi

Attorney at Stewart & Stewart

931 S Rangeline Rd

Carmel, IN 46032

Defendant Attorneys

Christina M Kamelhair

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Ind/IN

111 Monument Cir Ste 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Bonnie L Martin

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Ind/IN

111 Monument Cir Ste 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Cherry Malichi on behalf of James Desmith (Malichi, Cherry) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #23 MOTION to Withdraw /Remove Appearance of David W. Stewart Only. Attorney David W Stewart terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 08/20/2019. (jat) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Withdraw /Remove Appearance of David W. Stewart Only by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Stewart, Darron) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Appearance of Nicholas J. Wagner by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Wagner, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Wagner on behalf of James Desmith (Wagner, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

17 #1

Order

#17

(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Falks, Heather) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S Stewart on behalf of James Desmith (Stewart, Darron) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Kamelhair on behalf of Verizon Wireless Services LLC (Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L Martin on behalf of Verizon Wireless Services LLC (Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Desmith. Verizon Wireless Services LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Falks, Heather) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David W Stewart on behalf of JAMES DESMITH (Stewart, David) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather R Falks on behalf of JAMES DESMITH (Falks, Heather) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) Defendant's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Verizon Wireless Services LLC.(Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Cherry Malichi on behalf of James Desmith (Malichi, Cherry) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting #23 MOTION to Withdraw /Remove Appearance of David W. Stewart Only. Attorney David W Stewart terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 08/20/2019. (jat) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION to Withdraw /Remove Appearance of David W. Stewart Only by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Stewart, Darron) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas J Wagner terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/20/19. (slm) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Appearance of Nicholas J. Wagner by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Wagner, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Wagner on behalf of James Desmith (Wagner, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Heather R Falks terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/8/19. (slm) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Falks, Heather) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S Stewart on behalf of James Desmith (Stewart, Darron) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Verizon Wireless Services LLC.(Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Wireless Services LLC. (Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Kamelhair on behalf of Verizon Wireless Services LLC (Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L Martin on behalf of Verizon Wireless Services LLC (Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Desmith. Verizon Wireless Services LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Falks, Heather) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Verizon Wireless Services LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David W Stewart on behalf of JAMES DESMITH (Stewart, David) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather R Falks on behalf of JAMES DESMITH (Falks, Heather) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3750855.), filed by JAMES DESMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Falks, Heather) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less