This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2018 at 07:01:39 (UTC).

Design Basics, LLC v. Beringer Homes, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 Design Basics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Beringer Homes, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Design Basics, LLC

Defendants

Beringer Homes, Inc.

Richard E. Szatko

Jacquelyn J. Wegner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael T. Hopkins

Attorney at IP-Litigation. US, LLC

757 N. Broadway, Ste. 201

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Dana Andrew LeJune

Attorney at LeJune Law Firm

6525 Washington Avenue, Suite 300

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Richard E. Szatko. Richard E. Szatko waiver sent on 2/2/2018, answer due 4/3/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Jacquelyn J. Wegner. Jacquelyn J. Wegner waiver sent on 2/2/2018, answer due 4/3/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Beringer Homes, Inc. Beringer Homes, Inc. waiver sent on 2/2/2018, answer due 4/3/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#7

(#7) Request for Waiver of Service sent to Richard E. Szatko on 2/02/2018 by Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC. Waiver of Service due 3/5/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#6

(#6) Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (voc) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Richard E. Szatko. (voc) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

#3

(#3) Request for Waiver of Service sent to Beringer Homes on 2/02/2018 by Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC. Waiver of Service due 3/5/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

#2

(#2) Request for Waiver of Service sent to Jacquelyn Wegner on 2/02/2018 by Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC. Waiver of Service due 3/5/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

1 #10

Summons to Jacquelyn J. Wegner

1 #9

Summons to Richard Szatko

1 #8

Summons to Richard Szatko

1 #7

Exhibit 5 - DB's CR Notice

1 #6

Exhibit 4 - Complete Customer History

1 #5

Exhibit 3 - Infringing Works

1 #4

Exhibit 2 - DB Copeland CR & Deposit Materials

1 #3

Exhibit 1 - DB Monterrey CR & Deposit Materials

1 #2

Report on Filing Copyright Action AO121

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Richard E. Szatko. Richard E. Szatko waiver sent on 2/2/2018, answer due 4/3/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Jacquelyn J. Wegner. Jacquelyn J. Wegner waiver sent on 2/2/2018, answer due 4/3/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Beringer Homes, Inc. Beringer Homes, Inc. waiver sent on 2/2/2018, answer due 4/3/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Waiver of Service sent to Richard E. Szatko on 2/02/2018 by Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC. Waiver of Service due 3/5/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (voc) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Richard E. Szatko. (voc) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Waiver of Service sent to Beringer Homes on 2/02/2018 by Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC. Waiver of Service due 3/5/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Waiver of Service sent to Jacquelyn Wegner on 2/02/2018 by Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC. Waiver of Service due 3/5/2018. (LeJune, Dana) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2183833.), Filed by Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Filing Copyright Action AO121, #3 Exhibit 1 - DB Monterrey CR & Deposit Materials, #4 Exhibit 2 - DB Copeland CR & Deposit Materials, #5 Exhibit 3 - Infringing Works, #6 Exhibit 4 - Complete Customer History, #7 Exhibit 5 - DB's CR Notice, #8 Summons to Richard Szatko #9 Summons to Richard Szatko, #10 Summons to Jacquelyn J. Wegner) (LeJune, Dana) Modified on 2/1/2018: Jury Trial demanded in caption of the complaint, not on the Civil Cover Sheet. (lak) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less