This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2018 at 07:10:59 (UTC).

Derrick Sims v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 Derrick Sims filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Nancy A Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Abrams and S. James Otero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-06554

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Paul L. Abrams

S. James Otero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Derrick Sims

Defendant

Nancy A. Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven G Rosales

Attorney at Law Offices of Lawrence D Rohlfing

12631 East Imperial Highway Suite C115

Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670

Defendant Attorneys

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Assistant US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Lynn M Harada

Attorney at SAUSA - Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal. (ch) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#7

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby GRANTED. (ch) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • (#15) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV18-6554 PLA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Lynn M Harada added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Harada, Lynn) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Derrick Sims, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/15/2018, answer due 12/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal. (ch) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (ch) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby GRANTED. (ch) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Derrick Sims, (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (ghap) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Derrick Sims, (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Derrick Sims. (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Derrick Sims. (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Derrick Sims. (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Derrick Sims. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Derrick Sims(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.