This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2018 at 07:59:29 (UTC).

Denofre v. Wells Fargo & Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 Denofre filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against Wells Fargo Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon J. Quist and Timothy P. Greeley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00132

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon J. Quist

Referral Judge

Timothy P. Greeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rebecca Suzanne Denofre

Marquette, MI 49855

Defendants

Wells Fargo & Company

Darlene Korpi

Julie Johnson

Janet LaJoie

Sean Geary

Susan Johnson

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Rebecca Suzanne Denofre; (mlc) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED; denying #5 motion to appoint counsel; case closed; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Rebecca Suzanne Denofre (mlc) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#6

(#6) OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Rebecca Suzanne Denofre; (mlc) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Opinion #6 , Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Rebecca Suzanne Denofre (mlc) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED; denying #5 motion to appoint counsel; case closed; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Rebecca Suzanne Denofre; (mlc) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Rebecca Suzanne Denofre (mlc) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Rebecca Suzanne Denofre (mlc) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • COMPLAINT RECEIVED; IFP Decision Pending (mlc) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Rebecca Suzanne Denofre; (mlc) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Rebecca Suzanne Denofre (mlc) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.