This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:35:28 (UTC).

Demos v. Holbrook

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Demos filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Holbrook. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas O. Rice. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-05143

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas O. Rice

 

Party Details

Petitioner

John Robert Demos, Jr.

Walla Walla, WA 99362

Respondents

Donald R Holbrook

The Presiding Chief Judge of the US District Court

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#4

(#4) (DISREGARD) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) Modified text on 8/24/2018; filed in error (ems). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2018)

12 #1

Notice of Appeal

#9

(#9) ORDER CLOSING FILE. The Clerk of Court shall administratively CLOSE this file. The Clerk of Court is directed not to accept any documents for filing in this closed case and shall discard any documents submitted. No further action will be taken in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#7

(#7) PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $0, Receipt #IFP) Filed by John Robert Demos, Jr.(TR, Case Administrator) **30 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

1 #1

Attachment 1

12 #2

Docket Sheet

#12

(#12) Letter from Appeal Deputy Clerk to John Robert Demos Jr dated September 17, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet)(TR, Case Administrator)**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#13

(#13) COPY OF 9CCA Notice as to #10 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. 9CCA: 18-35793. (TR, Case Administrator)**1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00856. Docket sheet received. ** 1 Pg. PRINT ALL** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(JW, ECF Admin). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) 9CCA Payment Notification form re #10 Notice of Appeal. Fee Not Paid. (TR, Case Administrator)**1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by John Robert Demos #287455, Jr (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to #9 Order Closing File by John Robert Demos, Jr. (TR, Case Administrator)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) Modified on 9/24/2018: 9CCA 18-35793 (TR, Case Administrator). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • (#16) THIRD NOTICE of Change of Address. Notification received by prison/jail. New address: Monroe Correctional Complex - Twin Rivers Unit, PO Box 888, Monroe, WA 98272-0888. (TR, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#15) NOTICE of Change of Address. Notification received by prison/jail. New address: Washington State Penitentiary, 1313 N 13th Avenue, Walla Walla, WA 99362. (TR, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#14) NOTICE of Change of Address. Notification received by prison/jail. New address: Monroe Correctional Complex - Twin Rivers Unit, PO Box 888, Monroe, WA 98272-0888. (TR, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) COPY OF 9CCA Notice as to #10 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. 9CCA: 18-35793. (TR, Case Administrator)**1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Letter from Appeal Deputy Clerk to John Robert Demos Jr dated September 17, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet)(TR, Case Administrator)**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) 9CCA Payment Notification form re #10 Notice of Appeal. Fee Not Paid. (TR, Case Administrator)**1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to #9 Order Closing File by John Robert Demos, Jr. (TR, Case Administrator)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) Modified on 9/24/2018: 9CCA 18-35793 (TR, Case Administrator). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER CLOSING FILE. The Clerk of Court shall administratively CLOSE this file. The Clerk of Court is directed not to accept any documents for filing in this closed case and shall discard any documents submitted. No further action will be taken in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $0, Receipt #IFP) Filed by John Robert Demos, Jr.(TR, Case Administrator) **30 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00856. Docket sheet received. ** 1 Pg. PRINT ALL** (John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(JW, ECF Admin). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to Other District #5 , Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to John Robert Demos #287455, Jr. (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Michigan #4 was filed in error and should be disregarded (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) (DISREGARD) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) Modified text on 8/24/2018; filed in error (ems). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by John Robert Demos #287455, Jr (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/24/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.