This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2018 at 07:04:15 (UTC).

Demopoulos et al v. Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Demopoulos filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Dr Sameh H Aknouk Dental Services PC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary R. Brown and Joan M. Azrack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-04813

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gary R. Brown

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John A. Curcio

Demos P. Demopoulos

William Cassese

Kenneth Barrett

Daniel J. Gatto

Defendant

Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anusha Rasalingam

Attorney at Friedman & Anspach

1500 Broadway, Suite 2300

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Scott Porges

Attorney at Law Office of Matthew S. Porges, Esq.

641 President Street, Suite 205

Brooklyn, NY 11215

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (or otherwise move with respect to complaint) by Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC. (Porges, Matthew) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demos P. Demopoulos, William Cassese, Kenneth Barrett, Daniel J. Gatto, John A. Curcio. Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Rasalingam, Anusha) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

2 #1

Additional Corrections

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2018: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10680197 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Demos P. Demopoulos, William Cassese, Kenneth Barrett, Daniel J. Gatto, John A. Curcio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Rasalingam, Anusha) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended to10/26/18. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/26/2018. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (or otherwise move with respect to complaint) by Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC. (Porges, Matthew) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demos P. Demopoulos, William Cassese, Kenneth Barrett, Daniel J. Gatto, John A. Curcio. Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Rasalingam, Anusha) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2018: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Dr. Sameh H. Aknouk Dental Services PC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10680197 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Demos P. Demopoulos, William Cassese, Kenneth Barrett, Daniel J. Gatto, John A. Curcio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Rasalingam, Anusha) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Scott Porges