This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/27/2022 at 12:28:47 (UTC).

Dell Inc. v. Mishra et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2016 Dell Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Mishra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam Sparks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00641

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam Sparks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dell Inc.

Defendants

Tech Fixing Center LLC

Sameer Shaikh

Tushar Bose

Pro9 Infoservices Pvt. Ltd.

Webconnect LLC

Moshin Shaikh

Onlinetechsupports.net LLC

Anurag Gupta

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kimball R. Anderson

Sinead O'Carroll

Ross J. Corbett

Other Attorneys

Brian W. Clark

 

Court Documents

#195

(#195) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jv2) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#194

(#194) ORDER GRANTING #191 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction; ORDER re #192 Plaintiff's Notice Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jv2) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#192

(#192) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dell Inc. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

191 #1

Proposed Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction

#191

(#191) MOTION for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Tech Fixing Center LLC, Tushar Bose, Pro9 Infoservices Pvt. Ltd., Webconnect LLC, Mind Tree Infotech LLC, Paviter Singh, Simranjeet Singh, HS Digital Solutions LLC by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#190

(#190) IT IS ORDERED that by July 22, 2020, Plaintiff Dell, Inc. shall file appropriate pleadings that correct the deficiencies noted by the Court in its order dated June 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#189

(#189) ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #186 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction; DIMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #187 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jv2) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#187

(#187) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dell Inc. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

186 #1

Proposed Final Default Judgment

#186

(#186) MOTION for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Tech Fixing Center LLC, Tushar Bose, Pro9 Infoservices Pvt. Ltd., Webconnect LLC, Mind Tree Infotech LLC, Paviter Singh, Simranjeet Singh, and HS Digital Solutions LLC by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Default Judgment)(O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#7

(#7) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with a copy of complaint. (so) (Entered: 06/02/2016)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Raj Mishra and Tech Fixing Center LLC. (so) (Entered: 06/02/2016)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dell Inc.. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sinead O'Carroll (Robert H. Newman) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8527762) by on behalf of Dell Inc.. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

#3

Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sinead O'Carroll (Kimball R. Anderson). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm) (Entered: 06/02/2016)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc.. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-8527723), filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

268 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#195) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jv2) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#194) ORDER GRANTING #191 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction; ORDER re #192 Plaintiff's Notice Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jv2) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#192) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dell Inc. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#191) MOTION for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Tech Fixing Center LLC, Tushar Bose, Pro9 Infoservices Pvt. Ltd., Webconnect LLC, Mind Tree Infotech LLC, Paviter Singh, Simranjeet Singh, HS Digital Solutions LLC by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#190) IT IS ORDERED that by July 22, 2020, Plaintiff Dell, Inc. shall file appropriate pleadings that correct the deficiencies noted by the Court in its order dated June 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#189) ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #186 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction; DIMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #187 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jv2) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#187) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dell Inc. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#186) MOTION for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Tech Fixing Center LLC, Tushar Bose, Pro9 Infoservices Pvt. Ltd., Webconnect LLC, Mind Tree Infotech LLC, Paviter Singh, Simranjeet Singh, and HS Digital Solutions LLC by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Default Judgment)(O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#185) ORDER GRANTING #178 Dell's Agreed Motion to Sever; DISMISSING without Prejudice #179 Dell's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; and DISMISSING without Prejudice #180 Dell's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jv2) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#183) ORDER TO KEEP DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (Exhibits to #180 Plaintiff Dell Inc.'s Motion to Sever and for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jv2) Modified on 4/1/2020 (jv2). (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sinead O'Carroll (Kimball R. Anderson). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm) (Entered: 06/02/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with a copy of complaint. (so) (Entered: 06/02/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Raj Mishra and Tech Fixing Center LLC. (so) (Entered: 06/02/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dell Inc. (so) (Entered: 06/02/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (so) (Entered: 06/02/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dell Inc.. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sinead O'Carroll (Robert H. Newman) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8527762) by on behalf of Dell Inc.. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sinead O'Carroll (Kimball R. Anderson) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8527753) by on behalf of Dell Inc.. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc.. (O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-8527723), filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less