This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/24/2019 at 07:57:55 (UTC).

Delgado v. Dougherty et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 Delgado filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dougherty. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael P. Shea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02135

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis A Delgado

Newtown, CT 06470

Defendants

Dougherty

St. John

Ocasio

Colby

Thibodeau

Holloran

 

Court Documents

#7

15 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons

#15

#14

#13

12 #2

Envelope

12 #1

attachment

#12

#11

#10

#8

#4

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Envelope

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Timothy Halloran on 02/13/2019. Waiver of Service due by 3/20/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer Anthony Thibodeau on 02/11/2019. Waiver of Service due by 3/18/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ocasio waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons)(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dougherty waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/24/2019. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to St. John waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/24/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE identifying C.O. Thibodeau by Luis A Delgado, re 9 Order and supporting report re #11 Exhibit, (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 Envelope)(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EXHIBIT- Incident Report by Luis A Delgado. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Colby waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/24/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER. In order for the Clerk's office to comply with the Court's #7 order regarding service, the plaintiff is hereby directed to file a statement on the docket within 21 days that identifies the full name of defendant Thibodeau. Failure to respond by the deadline may result in dismissal of the plaintiff's claims against this defendant. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/23/2019. (Barclay, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kevin Ocasio, Matthew Colby and William St. John on 1/23/2019. Waiver of Service due by 2/27/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Standing Order re: Initial Discovery Disclosures Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 01/16/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. As set forth in the attached, the excessive force claims will proceed against defendants Ocasio, Colby, Thibodeau, and St. John in their individual capacities. The failure to protect claims will proceed against defendants Dougherty and Holloran in their individual capacities. All claims against the defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b).The Court enters the following orders:(1) The Clerk shall contact the Department of Correction Office of Legal Affairs to ascertain the service or current work address for each defendant, mail a waiver of service of process request packet containing the Complaint to each defendant at the address provided within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, and report to the court on the status of those waiver requests on the thirty-fifth day after mailing. If any defendant fails to return the waiver request, the Clerk shall make arrangements for in-person service by the U.S. Marshals Service on the defendant in his individual capacity and the defendant shall be required to pay the costs of such service in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d).(2) The Clerk shall send the plaintiff a copy of this Order.(3) The Clerk shall send a courtesy copy of the Complaint and this Order to the Connecticut Attorney General and the Department of Correction Office of Legal Affairs.(4) The defendants shall file their response to the complaint, either an answer or motion to dismiss, within sixty (60) days from the date the waiver forms are sent. If they choose to file an answer, they shall admit or deny the allegations and respond to the cognizable claim recited above. They also may include any and all additional defenses permitted by the Federal Rules.(5) Discovery, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 through 37, shall be completed within seven months (210 days) from the date of this order. Discovery requests need not be filed with the court.(6) All motions for summary judgment shall be filed within eight months (240 days) from the date of this order.(7) Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a), a nonmoving party must respond to a dispositive motion within twenty-one (21) days of the date the motion was filed. If no response is filed, or the response is not timely, the dispositive motion can be granted absent objection.(8) If the plaintiff changes his address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Court Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that the plaintiff MUST notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of the case. The plaintiff must give notice of a new address even if he is incarcerated. The plaintiff should write PLEASE NOTE MY NEW ADDRESS on the notice. It is not enough to just put the new address on a letter without indicating that it is a new address. If the plaintiff has more than one pending case, he should indicate all of the case numbers in the notification of change of address. The plaintiff should also notify the defendant or the attorney for the defendant of his new address.(9) The plaintiff shall utilize the Prisoner Efiling Program when filing documents with the court. The plaintiff is advised that the Program may be used only to file documents with the court. Local court rules provide that discovery requests are not filed with the court. D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 5(f). Therefore, discovery requests must be served on defendants counsel by regular mail. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/11/2019. (Barclay, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 12/28/2018. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/26/2018.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/26/2018.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/26/2018.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISCS MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luis A Delgado. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISCS COMPLAINT against Colby, Dougherty, Holloran, Ocasio, St. John, Thibodeau, filed by Luis A Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Colby is a litigant

Latest cases where ST JOHNS IN CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dougherty is a litigant