This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2019 at 07:06:27 (UTC).

Del Alcazar v. Jacobs Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 Del Alcazar filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Jacobs Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-08362

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.T. Del Alcazar

Defendants

Jacobs Technologies, Inc.

Jacobs Telecommunications, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David L. Miller

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Patrick William Chinnery

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, Llc

321 N. Clark St., Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer L Colvin

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's agreed amended motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #13 is granted to 2/25/19. Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #11 is moot. Motion hearing date of 1/23/19 is stricken. Initial status hearing previously set for 2/7/19 is stricken and reset to 3/5/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) (Notice of Agreed Amended Motion) NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer L Colvin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Colvin, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION by Defendant Jacobs Telecommunications, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Agreed Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead) (Colvin, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer L Colvin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Colvin, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION by Defendant Jacobs Telecommunications, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Colvin, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jacobs Telecommunications, Inc. by Jennifer L Colvin (Colvin, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Service of Court's Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery Order by J.T. Del Alcazar (Chinnery, Patrick) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.T. Del Alcazar as to Jacobs Telecommunications, Inc. on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Chinnery, Patrick) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 2/7/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jacobs Telecommunications, Inc. (yt) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED civil cover sheet #2 (Chinnery, Patrick) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J.T. Del Alcazar by Patrick William Chinnery (Chinnery, Patrick) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J.T. Del Alcazar by David L. Miller (Miller, David) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Miller, David) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by J.T. Del Alcazar; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15302639. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Miller, David) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacobs Telecommunications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Jacobs Technology, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer L Colvin