This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2018 at 08:04:07 (UTC).

VanHoose et al v. Waupaca Foundry Inc

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 VanHoose filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Waupaca Foundry Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01193

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ryan DeKeyser

Jason VanHoose

Thomas Cooper

Harley Granius

Carlos Lantz

Ronnie Smithers, Jr

Defendant

Waupaca Foundry Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Gordon Rudd, Jr

Attorney at Zimmerman Reed PLLP

1100 Ids Center, 80 S Eighth St

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4123

David W Garrison

Attorney at Barrett Johnson Martin & Garrison LLC

414 Union St - Ste 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Shawn M Raiter

Attorney at Larson King LLP

2800 Wells Fargo Pl, 30 E 7Th St

St Paul, MN 55101

Seth M Hyatt

Attorney at Barrett Johnson Martin & Garrison LLC

414 Union St - Ste 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Kelly A Lelo

Attorney at Larson King LLP

2800 Wells Fargo Pl, 30 E 7Th St

St Paul, MN 55101

T Joseph Snodgrass

Attorney at Larson King LLP

2800 Wells Fargo Pl, 30 E 7Th St

St Paul, MN 55101

Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell W Quick

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Paul E Benson

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Lee M Seese

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Joseph Louis Olson

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Alexander M DeGuire

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Michael D Best

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

444 W Lake St - Ste 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

Eric T Presnell

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1600 Division St - Ste 700

Nashville, TN 37203

Benjamin A Kaplan

Attorney at Crueger Dickinson LLC

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

 

Court Documents

#1

(#3) ORDER re #1 , The parties are now ordered to file a joint appendix containing only the documents related to the Tennessee claims in this case by October 4, 2017. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/12/17. (KFB, ) Modified on 9/12/2017 (KFB, ).This Order serviced via US Mail to attorneys not registered in ECF. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - EDTN Chattanooga Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Evansville Indiana Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - EDWI - Complaint

1 #1

Eastern District of Wisconsin Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC, )Notice mailed to attorney Rudd, Lelo, Bloodgood, Raier, Snodgrass. Attys Benson, Quick and Olson received electronic notice. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

#3

(#3) ORDER re #1 , The parties are now ordered to file a joint appendix containing only the documents related to the Tennessee claims in this case by October 4, 2017. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/12/17. (KFB, ) Modified on 9/12/2017 (KFB, ).This Order serviced via US Mail to attorneys not registered in ECF. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T Presnell on behalf of Thyssenkrupp Waupaca Inc. (Presnell, Eric) [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

#5

(#5) ORDER, The above-styled case has been reviewed pursuant to E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3), and the Court concludes this case is related to previously filed case No. 1:17-cv-56-TRM-SKL, styled Sarrell v. Waupaca Foundry, Inc., et al. No reassignment is necessary as this case is assigned to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/12/17. (KFB, ) Modified on 9/12/2017 (KFB, ). This Order serviced to all non ECF filers in this case. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

#65

(#100) ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE PARTIES' PROPOSED SETTLEMENT signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/14/2018. Fairness Hearing set for 1/24/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

#64

(#99) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2018. The Court approves the preliminary settlement. The parties will submit a proposed order to the Court for e-filing. (Tape #091418) (lh)

#98

RESTRICTED

#97

(#97) DISCLOSURE Statement by Waupaca Foundry Inc. (Benson, Paul)

96 #1

*Restricted*

#96

(#96) Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00248. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

92 #1

Exhibit A - Minutes of Telephonic Conference

92 #2

Exhibit B - Proposed Agreed Order

#95

(#95) ORDER granting #92 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/2/18. (KFB, ) Modified on 8/2/2018 (KFB, ). Order serviced to Attorney Michael Best. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

179 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE PARTIES' PROPOSED SETTLEMENT signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/14/2018. Fairness Hearing set for 1/24/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2018. The Court approves the preliminary settlement. The parties will submit a proposed order to the Court for e-filing. (Tape #091418) (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Waupaca Foundry Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Benson, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) DISCLOSURE Statement by Waupaca Foundry Inc. (Benson, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00248. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Case transferred to District of ED of Wisconsin, Green Bay Division. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (KFB, ) [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) ORDER granting #92 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/2/18. (KFB, ) Modified on 8/2/2018 (KFB, ). Order serviced to Attorney Michael Best. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) ORDER approving 152 the settlement agreement; adapting Report and Recommendations re 156 . Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/30/18. (KFB, ) Modified on 7/30/2018 (KFB, ). This Order serviced via US Mail to atty Best. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) ORDER, For good cause shown, and to conserve judicial resources, the partiesrequest to stay the scheduling order is GRANTED. All deadlines in the Courts scheduling order that have not already expired are hereby STAYED until further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/30/18. (KFB, ) Modified on 7/30/2018 (KFB, ). This Order serviced via US Mail to atty Best. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) by Thomas Cooper, Ryan DeKeyser, Harley Granius, Carlo Lantz. (KFB, ) [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Documents 6-8 mailed to non-ECF case participants. (GRE, ) [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/14/17. (GRE, ) [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/14/17. (GRE, ) [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/14/17. (GRE, ) [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER, The above-styled case has been reviewed pursuant to E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3), and the Court concludes this case is related to previously filed case No. 1:17-cv-56-TRM-SKL, styled Sarrell v. Waupaca Foundry, Inc., et al. No reassignment is necessary as this case is assigned to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/12/17. (KFB, ) Modified on 9/12/2017 (KFB, ). This Order serviced to all non ECF filers in this case. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T Presnell on behalf of Thyssenkrupp Waupaca Inc. (Presnell, Eric) [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER re #1 , The parties are now ordered to file a joint appendix containing only the documents related to the Tennessee claims in this case by October 4, 2017. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/12/17. (KFB, ) Modified on 9/12/2017 (KFB, ).This Order serviced via US Mail to attorneys not registered in ECF. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC, )Notice mailed to attorney Rudd, Lelo, Bloodgood, Raier, Snodgrass. Attys Benson, Quick and Olson received electronic notice. [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ORDER SEVERING AND TRANSFERRING THE CLAIMS OF THE NON-WISCONSIN OPT-INS.Signed by William C. Griesbach, Chief Judge on 9/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Eastern District of Wisconsin Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - EDWI - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Evansville Indiana Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - EDTN Chattanooga Complaint)(SAC, ) [Transferred from tned on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.