This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2019 at 07:43:36 (UTC).

Decker-Maloney, Morgen v. Jess, Cathy et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 Decker-Maloney, Morgen filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jess, Cathy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01072

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morgen M. Decker-Maloney

Fox Lake, WI 53933-0147

Defendants

Cathy A. Jess

Randall R. Hepp

Candace Whitman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Order that plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney's complaint taken under advisement for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/14/2019. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment the filing fee, dkt. #6 , is DENIED. $400 Filing Fee due 1/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/2/2019. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#6

(#6) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

5 #3

Exhibit C - Return mail sent to Bizzaro Law LLC

5 #2

Exhibit B - Rejection Letter from Attorney Paul Bucher

5 #1

Exhibit A - Example Letter to Attorney

#5

(#5) Declaration of Morgen M. Decker-Maloney re #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Example Letter to Attorney, #2 Exhibit B - Rejection Letter from Attorney Paul Bucher, #3 Exhibit C - Return mail sent to Bizzaro Law LLC) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#4

(#4) Motion for Appointment of Expert by Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#3

(#3) Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#2

(#2) Motion to Amend by Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

1 #5

Envelope

1 #4

Exhibit D - Inmate Complaint Appeal

1 #3

Exhibit C - Inmate Complaint Number FLCI-2018-20719

1 #2

Exhibit B - Correspondence

1 #1

Exhibit A - Letter and 9/18/18 Memo

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • Paid Prisoner PLRA Screening. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order that plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney's complaint taken under advisement for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/14/2019. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 34690033658. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment the filing fee, dkt. #6 , is DENIED. $400 Filing Fee due 1/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/2/2019. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (nln). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration of Morgen M. Decker-Maloney re #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Example Letter to Attorney, #2 Exhibit B - Rejection Letter from Attorney Paul Bucher, #3 Exhibit C - Return mail sent to Bizzaro Law LLC) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion for Appointment of Expert by Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to Amend by Plaintiff Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Morgen M. Decker-Maloney. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter and 9/18/18 Memo, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - Inmate Complaint Number FLCI-2018-20719, #4 Exhibit D - Inmate Complaint Appeal, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Envelope) (nln). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Case now non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson. Case no longer assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. This case is related to 16-cv-406-jdp. (nln) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.