This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2018 at 08:10:58 (UTC).

DECHAVES et al v. BARRETTA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 DECHAVES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BARRETTA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-11893

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FILOMENA DECHAVES

GERVASIO DECHAVES

Defendant

TODD C. BARRETTA

Summit, NJ 07901

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN MICHAEL BRESLIN

6 Apple Tree Lane, Second Floor

Sparta, NJ 07871

STEPHEN B. MCNALLY

Attorney at Wuersch & Gering LLC

100 Wall Street, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES re #8 Order, (MCNALLY, STEPHEN) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER that, Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to remand shall befiled by October 5, 2018. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by October 12, 2018; that, Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to serve Defendant with a copy ofthis Order within 3 business days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 9/11/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER that, the IN-PERSON conference before the Undersigned on August 22, 2018, is hereby rescheduled to September 7, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. at the United States Post Office & Courthouse, 1 Federal Square, Newark, New Jersey; that, Plaintiffs are directed to serve Defendant with a copy of thisOrder, by email and overnight mail, within 1 business day.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 8/20/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES re #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to Superior Court (MCNALLY, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER that, there shall be an IN-PERSON conference before the Undersigned on August 22, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. at the United States Post Office & Courthouse, 1 Federal Square, Newark, New Jersey; that, Plaintiffs are directed to serve Defendant with a copy of this Order, by email and overnight mail, within 1 business day. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 8/16/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Emergent Application for R

#4

(#4) Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Emergency Motion for Remand by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Emergent Application for Remand)(MCNALLY, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

3 #10

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Remanding Case

3 #9

Exhibit G - 8-10 Appellate division Vacation of Warrant of Removal

3 #8

Exhibit F - Supreme Court Remand to Appellate Division

3 #7

Exhibit E - 8-6 Amended Authorization Appellate Division

3 #6

Exhibit D - 8-3 Appellate Division AUthorization to File Emergent Motion

3 #5

Exhibit C to Certification - District Court Removal Docket

3 #4

Exhibit B to Certification - District Court Appeal Docket

3 #3

Exhibit A to Certification - BK Docket

3 #2

Certification of Documents Previously Filed

3 #1

Brief in Support of Motion for Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1452(b) and for Sanctio

#3

(#3) Emergency MOTION to Remand to Superior Court by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1452(b) and for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c), #2 Certification of Documents Previously Filed, #3 Exhibit A to Certification - BK Docket, #4 Exhibit B to Certification - District Court Appeal Docket, #5 Exhibit C to Certification - District Court Removal Docket, #6 Exhibit D - 8-3 Appellate Division AUthorization to File Emergent Motion, #7 Exhibit E - 8-6 Amended Authorization Appellate Division, #8 Exhibit F - Supreme Court Remand to Appellate Division, #9 Exhibit G - 8-10 Appellate division Vacation of Warrant of Removal, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Remanding Case)(MCNALLY, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES re #8 Order, (MCNALLY, STEPHEN) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER that, Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to remand shall befiled by October 5, 2018. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by October 12, 2018; that, Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to serve Defendant with a copy ofthis Order within 3 business days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 9/11/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Case Management Conference held on 9/7/2018. (CD #ECR.) (LM, ) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER that, the IN-PERSON conference before the Undersigned on August 22, 2018, is hereby rescheduled to September 7, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. at the United States Post Office & Courthouse, 1 Federal Square, Newark, New Jersey; that, Plaintiffs are directed to serve Defendant with a copy of thisOrder, by email and overnight mail, within 1 business day.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 8/20/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES re #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to Superior Court (MCNALLY, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER that, there shall be an IN-PERSON conference before the Undersigned on August 22, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. at the United States Post Office & Courthouse, 1 Federal Square, Newark, New Jersey; that, Plaintiffs are directed to serve Defendant with a copy of this Order, by email and overnight mail, within 1 business day. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 8/16/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to Superior Court. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Emergency Motion for Remand by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Emergent Application for Remand)(MCNALLY, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Emergency MOTION to Remand to Superior Court by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1452(b) and for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c), #2 Certification of Documents Previously Filed, #3 Exhibit A to Certification - BK Docket, #4 Exhibit B to Certification - District Court Appeal Docket, #5 Exhibit C to Certification - District Court Removal Docket, #6 Exhibit D - 8-3 Appellate Division AUthorization to File Emergent Motion, #7 Exhibit E - 8-6 Amended Authorization Appellate Division, #8 Exhibit F - Supreme Court Remand to Appellate Division, #9 Exhibit G - 8-10 Appellate division Vacation of Warrant of Removal, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Remanding Case)(MCNALLY, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TODD C. BARRETTA from NJ Superior Court Law Division, Special Civil Part: Union County, case number UNN LT-L-02229-18., filed by TODD C. BARRETTA.(ld, ) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TODD C. BARRETTA from NJ Superior Court Law Division, Special Civil Part: Union County, case number UNN LT-L-02229-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW036972), filed by TODD C. BARRETTA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen McNally